California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:14-cr-00380
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2014
Terminated:Jun 17, 2016
Last checked: Friday Mar 27, 2015 8:07 AM PDT
Defendant
FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. (3)
Represented By
Patrick Maben Hammon
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher Flom
contact info
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Cristina C. Arguedas
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
Raphael M. Goldman
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
William Jerry Casey
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Connie Lewis Lensing
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Ted W. Cassman
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
Jack Patrick DiCanio
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
FedEx Corporation (1)
Represented By
Patrick Maben Hammon
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher Flom
contact info
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Cristina C. Arguedas
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
Raphael M. Goldman
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
William Jerry Casey
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Connie Lewis Lensing
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Ted W. Cassman
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
Jack Patrick DiCanio
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Federal Express Corporation (2)
Represented By
Patrick Maben Hammon
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher Flom
contact info
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Cristina C. Arguedas
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
Raphael M. Goldman
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
William Jerry Casey
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Connie Lewis Lensing
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Ted W. Cassman
Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP
contact info
Jack Patrick DiCanio
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kirstin M. Ault
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kyle F. Waldinger
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info

GPO Oct 05 2015
ORDER Requiring Defendant to Respond to the Government's Submission by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 10/5/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)ORDER Requiring Defendant to Respond to the Government's Submission by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 10/5/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)ORDER Requiring Defendant to Respond to the Government's Submission by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 10/5/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
GPO Jan 19 2016
ORDER RE FEDEX'S REQUEST FOR GRAND JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 1/19/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)ORDER RE FEDEX'S REQUEST FOR GRAND JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 1/19/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)ORDER RE FEDEX'S REQUEST FOR GRAND JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 1/19/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
GPO Jan 21 2016
ORDER REQUIRING IN CAMERA REVIEW AND DETAILED WRITTEN EXPLANATIONS FOR REDACTED DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)ORDER REQUIRING IN CAMERA REVIEW AND DETAILED WRITTEN EXPLANATIONS FOR REDACTED DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)ORDER REQUIRING IN CAMERA REVIEW AND DETAILED WRITTEN EXPLANATIONS FOR REDACTED DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
GPO Feb 22 2016
ORDER RE EX PARTE OPPOSITION TO GOVERNMENT'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)ORDER RE EX PARTE OPPOSITION TO GOVERNMENT'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)ORDER RE EX PARTE OPPOSITION TO GOVERNMENT'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
GPO Mar 01 2016
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(B) DISCLOSURE DATE signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 3/1/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)ORDER SETTING RULE 16(B) DISCLOSURE DATE signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 3/1/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)ORDER SETTING RULE 16(B) DISCLOSURE DATE signed by Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 3/1/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
GPO Mar 04 2016
ORDER RE RULE 12.3 DISCLOSURES by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/4/16 (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016).ORDER RE RULE 12.3 DISCLOSURES by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/4/16 (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016).ORDER RE RULE 12.3 DISCLOSURES by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/4/16 (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016).
GPO Mar 18 2016
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Disclosure of Redacted Discovery Materials. The United States shall produce documents consistent with this Order no later than March 24, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Disclosure of Redacted Discovery Materials. The United States shall produce documents consistent with this Order no later than March 24, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion for Disclosure of Redacted Discovery Materials. The United States shall produce documents consistent with this Order no later than March 24, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
GPO Mar 18 2016
ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS DUE TO EXPIRATION OF THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/18/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS DUE TO EXPIRATION OF THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/18/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS DUE TO EXPIRATION OF THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/18/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
GPO Apr 06 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PRODUCE DRUG EXHIBITS FOR TESTING BY DEFENSE 234. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PRODUCE DRUG EXHIBITS FOR TESTING BY DEFENSE 234. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PRODUCE DRUG EXHIBITS FOR TESTING BY DEFENSE 234. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
GPO Apr 18 2016
ORDER DENYING 208 MOTION TO DISMISS THE INDICTMENT BASED ON GRAND JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/18/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/19/2016 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).ORDER DENYING 208 MOTION TO DISMISS THE INDICTMENT BASED ON GRAND JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/18/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/19/2016 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).ORDER DENYING 208 MOTION TO DISMISS THE INDICTMENT BASED ON GRAND JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/18/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/19/2016 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
GPO Apr 20 2016
ORDER RE GOVERNMENT'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF INFORMATION WITHHELD BASED ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/20/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)ORDER RE GOVERNMENT'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF INFORMATION WITHHELD BASED ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/20/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)ORDER RE GOVERNMENT'S REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE OF INFORMATION WITHHELD BASED ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/20/16. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
GPO Apr 21 2016
ORDER DIRECTING THE GOVERNMENT TO FILE A SUBMISSION REGARDING SIMILAR PROSECUTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/21/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)ORDER DIRECTING THE GOVERNMENT TO FILE A SUBMISSION REGARDING SIMILAR PROSECUTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/21/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)ORDER DIRECTING THE GOVERNMENT TO FILE A SUBMISSION REGARDING SIMILAR PROSECUTIONS by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/21/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
GPO Jun 01 2016
ORDER RE JUNE 1 ADMIN MOTION by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/1/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)ORDER RE JUNE 1 ADMIN MOTION by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/1/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)ORDER RE JUNE 1 ADMIN MOTION by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/1/16. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
GPO Jun 17 2016
ORDER DISMISSING ALL CHARGES as to FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 6/17/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)ORDER DISMISSING ALL CHARGES as to FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 6/17/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)ORDER DISMISSING ALL CHARGES as to FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 6/17/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
Docket last updated: 02/02/2024 10:33 AM PST
Thursday, July 17, 2014
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT as to FedEx Corporation (1) count(s) 1, 2-10, 11, 12, 13-14, 15, FedEx Express, Inc. (2) count(s) 1, 2-10, 11, 12, 13-14, 15, FedEx Corporation Services, Inc. (3) count(s) 1, 2-10, 11, 12, 13-14, 15. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet