Maryland District Court
Judge:Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
Case #: 8:21-cv-01580
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 22, 2021 4:32 AM EST
Defendant
Lloyd Austin , III
Represented By
Patrick Garrett Selwood
United States Attorneys Office, District Of Maryland
contact info
Defendant
Defense Health Agency
Represented By
Patrick Garrett Selwood
United States Attorneys Office, District Of Maryland
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie Sneed
1234 Massachusetts Ave Nw
Washington, DC 20005
Represented By
Patrick Garrett Selwood
United States Attorneys Office, District Of Maryland
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise N. Neath
1012 K Street NE
Washington, DC 20002

GPO May 10 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 5/10/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Mar 06 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 3/7/2023. (c/m 3/6/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 06, 2023
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/07 8:21 AM
ORDER Granting14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 3/6/2023. (c/m 3/7/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
25 25 14 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 03/07 8:18 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 3/7/2023. (c/m 3/6/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
24 24 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 07/22 3:57 PM
ORDER granting23 Joint MOTION to Seal Exhibits and for Entry of a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 7/22/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 07/22 10:15 AM
Joint MOTION to Seal Exhibits and for Entry of a Protective Order by Lloyd Austin, III, Defense Health Agency, Stephanie Sneed(Selwood, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
22 22 respm Response Tue 05/17 12:58 PM
RESPONSE re21 Order filed by Denise N. Neath.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/10 3:06 PM
ORDER establishing additional briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 5/10/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
20 20 5 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 05/10 3:04 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 5/10/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 05/02 5:21 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 5/2/2022. (babs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/29 4:29 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/09 4:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Denise N. Neath.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, February 18, 2022
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/18 12:29 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Lloyd Austin, III, Defense Health Agency, Stephanie Sneed(Selwood, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1- ROI (Part I, pp. 1-115),
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 - ROI (Part I, pp. 116-231),
Att: 5 Exhibit 1 - ROI (Part I, pp. 232-320),
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 - ROI (Part I, pp. 321-420),
Att: 7 Exhibit 1 - ROI (Part I, pp. 421-461),
Att: 8 Exhibit 2 - Kessler SF-50,
Att: 9 Exhibit 3 - Parchment SF-50,
Att: 10 Exhibit 4 - Wright SF-50,
Att: 11 Exhibit 5 - Neath Appraisals,
Att: 12 Exhibit 6 - Kessler Appraisals,
Att: 13 Exhibit 7 - Wright Appraisals,
Att: 14 Exhibit 8 - Parchment Appraisals,
Att: 15 Exhibit 9 - Miskovsky SF-50,
Att: 16 Exhibit 10 - Brooks SF-50,
Att: 17 Exhibit 11 - Miskovsky Appraisals,
Att: 18 Exhibit 12 - Col. Weina Depo.,
Att: 19 Exhibit 13 - NCR Notice of Vaccine Mandate,
Att: 20 Exhibit 14 - Memo. of Understanding,
Att: 21 Exhibit 15 - 2018 Instruction,
Att: 22 Exhibit 16 - 2012 Instruction,
Att: 23 Exhibit 17 - EEOC Judgment,
Att: 24 Exhibit 18 - EEOC Case Assign. & Order,
Att: 25 Exhibit 19 - Brooks Depo.,
Att: 26 Exhibit 20 - Acosta Depo.,
Att: 27 Exhibit 21 - EEOC Discovery,
Att: 28 Exhibit 22 - EEOC Motion
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/15 11:06 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by four days (through February 18, 2022) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 2/15/2022. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/14 9:36 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by four days (through February 18, 2022) by Lloyd Austin, III, Defense Health Agency, Stephanie Sneed.(Selwood, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
11 11 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 01/18 1:30 PM
Request for Permission to File Pleadings Via the Court's Electronic Case Filing System filed by Denise Neath(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, January 13, 2022
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/13 12:17 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall have only a 30 day extension, not 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 1/13/2022. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/11 10:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Lloyd Austin, III, Defense Health Agency, Stephanie Sneed.(Selwood, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, January 06, 2022
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/06 12:31 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 1/6/2022. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/26 10:49 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Lloyd Austin, III, Defense Health Agency, Stephanie Sneed.(Selwood, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, October 18, 2021
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/18 11:14 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 10/18/2021. (Day, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/15 5:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Lloyd Austin, III, Defense Health Agency, Stephanie Sneed.(Selwood, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 08/10 1:46 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Lloyd Austin, III, Defense Health Agency, Stephanie Sneed, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/10 1:44 PM
ORDER directing Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 8/10/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
2 2 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Fri 06/25 2:45 PM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Denise N. Neath. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/25 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Lloyd Austin, III, Defense Health Agency, Stephanie Sneed ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 84637037452.), filed by Denise N. Neath.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons