New Jersey District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcnulty
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:21-cv-12998
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Terminated:Feb 08, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 11:32 PM EDT
Defendant
APOTEX, INC.
Represented By
TYLER DOH
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
GERI L. ALBIN
Saiber LLC
contact info
ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Saiber LLC
contact info
VISHAL CHANDRA GUPTA
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Notice Only
F. DOMINIC CERRITO
Notice Only
ANGUS CHEN
Notice Only
PHV JOHN P. GALANEK
Notice Only
PHV MICHAEL GREEN, ESQ.
Notice Only
PHV QUENTIN JORGENSEN
Notice Only
PHV LAWRENCE T. KASS
Notice Only
PHV ELIZABETH J. MURPHY
Notice Only
PHV CARLY ROMANOWICZ
Notice Only
PHV LILLIAN WALLACE
Plaintiff
ARIAD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By
CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Gibbons PC
contact info
RACHEL SPEARS JOHNSTON
Gibbons, P.C.
contact info
ROBERT C. BRADY
Gibbons, PC
contact info
STEPHEN R. DONAT
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
FRANK CHARLES CALVOSA
Quinn Emanuel Uquhart & Sullival LLP
contact info
BRIAN JOHN FORSATZ
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLC
contact info
JASON ROBERT HALPIN
Gibbons PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Gibbons PC
contact info
RACHEL SPEARS JOHNSTON
Gibbons, P.C.
contact info
ROBERT C. BRADY
Gibbons, PC
contact info
STEPHEN R. DONAT
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
FRANK CHARLES CALVOSA
Quinn Emanuel Uquhart & Sullival LLP
contact info
BRIAN JOHN FORSATZ
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLC
contact info
JASON ROBERT HALPIN
Gibbons PC
contact info
Plaintiff
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.
Represented By
CHARLES H. CHEVALIER
Gibbons PC
contact info
RACHEL SPEARS JOHNSTON
Gibbons, P.C.
contact info
ROBERT C. BRADY
Gibbons, PC
contact info
STEPHEN R. DONAT
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
FRANK CHARLES CALVOSA
Quinn Emanuel Uquhart & Sullival LLP
contact info
BRIAN JOHN FORSATZ
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLC
contact info
JASON ROBERT HALPIN
Gibbons PC
contact info

GPO Jan 13 2023
OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/13/2023. (jd, )

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/08 11:25 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
128 128 order Order Tue 02/07 2:31 PM
TEXT ORDER - Due to the filing of the consent judgment [D.E. 127], the February 28, 2023 conference is canceled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/7/2023. (jis)
Related: [-]
127 127 4 pgs order Order Tue 02/07 2:25 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/7/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
126 126 misc Proposed Order Mon 02/06 7:55 PM
Proposed Order CONSENT JUDGMENT by All Plaintiffs. (BRADY, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
125 125 order Order Thu 02/02 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER - At the parties' request, the February 3, 2023 conference is canceled.The conference previously scheduled for February 28, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. [D.E. 115], will be the next status conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/2/2023. (jis)
Related: [-]