New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Hammer
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:21-cv-13013
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Terminated:Jun 26, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 22, 2021 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
CONSUELO CARPENTER
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Defendant
THE BOROUGH OF BOGOTA
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Defendant
DANIEL FEDE
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT ROBBINS
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT PITERSKI
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Defendant
TOM NAPOLITANO
BOROUGH OF BOGOTA 375 LARCH AVE.
BOGOTA, NJ 07603
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MARY ELLEN MURPHY
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL CONNORS
BOROUGH OF BOGOTA 375 LARCH AVE.
BOGOTA, NJ 07603
Represented By
NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI
Botta Angeli, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH MARANTE
302 COMMUNIPAW AVE.
JERSEY CITY, NJ 07304
Represented By
PAUL I. PERKINS
The Perkins Firm, LLC
contact info
BRUCE ERIC BALDINGER
The Law Office Of Bruce E. Baldinger, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ROBERT FREEMAN
302 COMMUNIPAW AVE
JERSEY CITY, NJ 07304
Represented By
PAUL I. PERKINS
The Perkins Firm, LLC
contact info
BRUCE ERIC BALDINGER
The Law Office Of Bruce E. Baldinger, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NO PLACE INN, INC.
Represented By
PAUL I. PERKINS
The Perkins Firm, LLC
contact info
BRUCE ERIC BALDINGER
The Law Office Of Bruce E. Baldinger, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BUDDYS REALTY, CO.
302 COMMUNIPAW AVE.
JERSEY CITY, NJ 07304
Represented By
PAUL I. PERKINS
The Perkins Firm, LLC
contact info
BRUCE ERIC BALDINGER
The Law Office Of Bruce E. Baldinger, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 08, 2024
43 43 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Thu 02/08 1:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CONSUELO CARPENTER, MICHAEL CONNORS, DANIEL FEDE, DANIELE FEDE, CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN, MARY ELLEN MURPHY, TOM NAPOLITANO, ROBERT ROBBINS, THE BOROUGH OF BOGOTA. (ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
42 42 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Mon 06/26 9:28 AM
ORDER Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 8/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/26/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
41 41 order Order Tue 06/06 9:07 AM
TEXT ORDER: It having been reported to the Court that the parties have reached tentative agreement on settlement terms pending approval by the Governing Body of Defendant Bogota, if any party objects to the Court entering a 60-day Order of dismissal without prejudice to the right of any party to re-open the matter within 60 days if settlement is not finalized, that party shall file an objection no later than June 23, 2024. Failure to object by June 23, 2024 will be deemed consent to entry of the 60-day Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/6/2023. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
40 40 misc Letter Mon 06/05 10:44 AM
Letter from Parties re settlement. (ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
39 39 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/30 9:25 AM
LETTER ORDER granting38 Joint Request for a one (1) week extension of time, until 6/2/2023, to submit a revised Scheduling Order in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/30/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 29, 2023
38 38 misc Letter Mon 05/29 5:14 PM
Letter from Paul I. Perkins, Esq.. (PERKINS, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
37 37 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/19 3:13 PM
LETTER ORDER granting36 Defendants Borough of Bogota, Mayor and Council, former Councilman Tom Napolitano, and Chief Daniel Maye's Request for a one (1) week extension of time to submit a Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/19/2023. (dam)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Letter Fri 05/19 11:26 AM
Letter from Parties. (ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
35 35 order Order Fri 05/05 2:22 PM
TEXT ORDER: As discussed at the conclusion of the May 5, 2023 settlement conference, the parties will meet and confer on the remaining steps to complete fact discovery, and jointly propose by May 19, 2023 an amended scheduling order for the completion of all fact discovery, exchange of expert reports, and completion of expert discovery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/5/2023. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 05/16 3:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Settlement Conference held on 5/5/2023. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
34 34 order Order Fri 04/28 3:59 PM
TEXT ORDER: On or before May 2, 2023, each party may submit a confidential settlement memorandum not to exceed five double-spaced pages (excluding exhibits) via njdnef_hammer@njd.uscourts.gov. If a party intends to submit numerous or lengthy exhibits, or photographic exhibits, the Court requests that party kindly submit a hard copy with tabbed exhibits in addition to emailing the memorandum. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/28/2023. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
33 33 order Order Tue 02/07 2:19 PM
TEXT ORDER: There will be a settlement conference via Zoom on May 5, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. In addition to counsel, clients with full and complete authority to settle this matter are required to attend and participate via Zoom throughout the conference. Client participation is critical to any productive settlement negotiation. Therefore, failure by any party to attend the conference will necessitate adjournment of the conference. On or before May 2, 2023, each party may submit a confidential settlement memorandum not to exceed five double-spaced pages (excluding exhibits) via njdnef_hammer@njd.uscourts.gov. If a party intends to submit numerous or lengthy exhibits, or photographic exhibits, the Court requests that party kindly submit a hard copy with tabbed exhibits in addition to emailing the memorandum. All discovery is stayed pending the settlement conference, and deadlines will be addressed if necessary at the conclusion of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/7/2023. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 02/07 2:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 2/7/2023. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
32 32 order Order Mon 01/23 11:54 AM
TEXT ORDER: There will be a call with the Undersigned on February 7, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter access code 1456817# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/23/23. (tad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
31 31 misc Letter Fri 01/20 3:33 PM
Letter from Parties re 30 Order,. (ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
30 30 order Order Fri 01/13 12:13 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear for the January 13, 2023 telephone conference. Defense counsel appeared. Accordingly, on or before January 20, 2023, the parties will file a joint status letter concerning their progress in completing discovery, and provide a jointly proposed date for the next telephone conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/13/2023. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
29 29 order Order Thu 01/12 4:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: Tomorrow's telephone conference shall proceed at 12:00 p.m., rather than at 10:00 a.m. The dial-in information remains unchanged. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/12/2023. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
28 28 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/07 4:47 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER that there shall be a Telephone Conference on 1/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Any Motion to add new parties or Amend Pleadings due by 10/21/2022. Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/6/2022. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 09/02 11:54 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT SUBMISSION OF STATUS by All Plaintiffs. (PERKINS, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
order Order Mon 08/29 12:15 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference on 9/1/2022 is adjourned without a new date. The parties shall submit a joint status report by 9/2/2022 to njdnef_hammer@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/29/2022. (jqb, ) Modified on 8/29/2022 (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
24 24 misc Letter Thu 08/25 11:14 AM
Letter from Parties re Settlement Conference re 23 Order. (ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 08/25 10:03 AM
TEXT ORDER: On or before August 29, 2022, each party shall submit a settlement memorandum, not to exceed five (5) pages, to njdnef_hammer@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/25/2022. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 08/25 12:10 PM
TEXT ORDER: In view of the parties' August 25, 2022 letter [D.E. 24], the September 1, 2022 settlement conference is converted to a telephone conference that will take place at the same time. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter 1456817# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/25/2022. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/20 9:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA MARIE GURRERA on behalf of ROBERT PITERSKI (GURRERA, ANGELA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
order Order Tue 05/17 3:37 PM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the discussion at the May 17, 2022 telephone status conference, there will be a Zoom settlement conference with the Undersigned on September 1, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. Any scheduling conflict with September 1st shall be brought to the Court's attention by June 15, 2022. The Court will provide the parties with the Zoom link in advance of the conference. In addition to counsel, clients or their representatives with full and complete authority to settle this matter are required to appear via Zoom for the conference. On or before August 29, 2022, each party shall submit a settlement memorandum, not to exceed five (5) pages, to njdnef_hammer@njd.uscourts.gov. Prior to the settlement conference, the parties shall complete all written discovery. The deadlines to complete depositions, expert reports and expert depositions are held in abeyance pending the settlement conference, and will be rescheduled if necessary at the conclusion of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/17/2022. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 05/17 5:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 5/17/2022. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
20 20 misc Substitution of Attorney Wed 03/23 12:17 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI terminated. Attorney ERIC L. HARRISON for ROBERT PITERSKI added.. (HARRISON, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
order Order Tue 02/01 2:44 PM
TEXT ORDER: The next telephone status conference will be on May 17, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. To join the call, counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852 and enter access code 1456817#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/22. (tad)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 02/02 11:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 2/1/2022. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
order Order Wed 01/05 11:23 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference on 1/25/2022 is adjourned to 2/1/2022 at 2:30 p.m. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. Please mark your calendar accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/5/2022. (jqb, ) Modified on 1/5/2022 (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
17 17 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 10/15 10:40 AM
CONSENT ORDER to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by BUDDYS REALTY, CO., CONSUELO CARPENTER, MICHAEL CONNORS, DANIEL FEDE, DANIELE FEDE, ROBERT FREEMAN, CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN, JOSEPH MARANTE, MARY ELLEN MURPHY, TOM NAPOLITANO, NO PLACE INN, INC., ROBERT PITERSKI, ROBERT ROBBINS, THE BOROUGH OF BOGOTA. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/1/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
16 16 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge SSA Thu 09/30 9:39 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by CONSUELO CARPENTER, MICHAEL CONNORS, DANIEL FEDE, DANIELE FEDE, CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN.. (ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/29 3:47 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 09/30 4:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 9/29/2021. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
14 14 discov Joint Discovery Plan Wed 09/22 9:21 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by All Defendants.(ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
13 13 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/30 3:34 PM
ORDER Amending Caption and Correcting the Identification of Defendant; The caption of the Complaint is amended to reflect the proper identification of Daniel Fede as "Daniele" Fede. etc. (Docket Sheet Updated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/30/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 08/11 9:05 AM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 9/27/2021. The parties will dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/11/2021. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/11 11:29 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption to Properly Identify a Party . Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
11 11 motion Amend/Correct Tue 08/10 3:13 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption to Properly Identify a Party by BUDDYS REALTY, CO., ROBERT FREEMAN, JOSEPH MARANTE, NO PLACE INN, INC..(BALDINGER, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Bruce E. Baldinger, Esq.,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 30, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/30 2:15 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CONSUELO CARPENTER, MICHAEL CONNORS, DANIEL FEDE, CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN, DANIEL MAYE, MARY ELLEN MURPHY, TOM NAPOLITANO, ROBERT PITERSKI, ROBERT ROBBINS, THE BOROUGH OF BOGOTA.(ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
9 9 order Order Reassigning Case Thu 07/29 12:33 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Madeline Cox Arleo no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/29/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Tue 07/20 11:21 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The8 Application 6.1 filed by Defendants on 7/19/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Letter. For future filings of this nature, please select the event "Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 07/20 11:23 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document8 Application submitted by DANIEL MAYE, ROBERT PITERSKI, TOM NAPOLITANO, THE BOROUGH OF BOGOTA, MARY ELLEN MURPHY, CONSUELO CARPENTER, ROBERT ROBBINS, CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN, DANIEL FEDE, MICHAEL CONNORS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/3/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
8 8 misc Letter Mon 07/19 10:39 AM
Letter from Defendants requesting extension. (ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/19 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIA RAWAN ANGELI on behalf of All Defendants (ANGELI, NATALIA)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/02 10:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO PLACE INN, INC., ROBERT FREEMAN, JOSEPH MARANTE, BUDDYS REALTY, CO.. TOM NAPOLITANO served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (BALDINGER, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/30 2:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NO PLACE INN, INC., ROBERT FREEMAN, JOSEPH MARANTE, BUDDYS REALTY, CO.. CONSUELO CARPENTER served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; MICHAEL CONNORS served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; DANIEL FEDE served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; DANIEL MAYE served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; MARY ELLEN MURPHY served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; ROBERT PITERSKI served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; ROBERT ROBBINS served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021; THE BOROUGH OF BOGOTA served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (BALDINGER, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 06/29 11:01 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CONSUELO CARPENTER, MICHAEL CONNORS, DANIEL FEDE, CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN, DANIEL MAYE, MARY ELLEN MURPHY, TOM NAPOLITANO, ROBERT PITERSKI, ROBERT ROBBINS, THE BOROUGH OF BOGOTA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
3 3 service Summons - Request for Issue Mon 06/28 4:24 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by NO PLACE INN, INC. (d/b/a Buddys Place), ROBERT FREEMAN, JOSEPH MARANTE, BUDDYS REALTY, CO. as to BOROUGH OF BOGOTA, CONSUELO CARPENTER, MICHAEL CONNORS, DANIELE FEDE, CHRISTOPHER KELEMEN, DANIEL MAYE, MARY ELLEN MURPHY, TOM NAPOLITANO, ROBERT PITERSKI, ROBERT ROBBINS.(BALDINGER, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Request for Summons - Carpenter,
Att: 2 Summons Request for Summons - Connors,
Att: 3 Summons Request for Summons - Fede,
Att: 4 Summons Request for Summons - Keleman,
Att: 5 Summons Request for Summons - Maye,
Att: 6 Summons Request for Summons - Murphy,
Att: 7 Summons Request for Summons - Napolitano,
Att: 8 Summons Request for Summons - Piterski,
Att: 9 Summons Request for Summons - Robbins
2 2 misc Exhibit (to Document) Mon 06/28 2:49 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint JS-44, Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (PERKINS, PAUL)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Mon 06/28 10:12 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ps)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/28 5:14 PM
Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/25 7:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12580681) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NO PLACE INN, INC. (d/b/a Buddys Place), ROBERT FREEMAN, JOSEPH MARANTE, BUDDYS REALTY, CO..(PERKINS, PAUL)
Related: [-]