New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-12238
Case Filed:May 27, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 26, 2021 3:59 AM EDT
Defendant
FRANCISCO LANDEROS (2)
Represented By
STACY A. BIANCAMANO
Biancamano Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO (3)
Represented By
LORRAINE S. GAULI-RUFO
contact info
Defendant
JOEL VASQUEZ (1)
Represented By
JOHN MCMAHON
Law Office Of John J. Mcmahon, Esq
contact info
SAVERIO A. VIGGIANO
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
GEORGE BRANDLEY
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
KIMBERLY MITCHELL
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/26/2021 4:24 AM EDT
Thursday, May 27, 2021
Arrest of JOEL VASQUEZ (seb)
Related: [-]
Interpreter Irene Caramuta sworn in case as to JOEL VASQUEZ (seb)
Related: [-]
Arrest of FRANCISCO LANDEROS (seb)
Related: [-]
Arrest of ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO (seb)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to JOEL VASQUEZ (1), FRANCISCO LANDEROS (2), ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO (3). (seb)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark:Initial Appearance as to JOEL VASQUEZ held on 5/27/2021. Defendant advised of rights. AFPD appointed. Defendant consents to detention with the right to make a bail application at a later time. (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom.) (seb)).
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to JOEL VASQUEZ SAVERIO A. VIGGIANO for JOEL VASQUEZ appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF DETENTION as to JOEL VASQUEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by JOEL VASQUEZ (executed on the record). (seb)
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER as to JOEL VASQUEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark:Initial Appearance as to FRANCISCO LANDEROS held on 5/27/2021. Defendant advised of rights. CJA appointed. Defendant consents to detention with the right to make a bail application at a later time. (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom.) (seb)
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 20 as to FRANCISCO LANDEROS: Appointment of Attorney STACY A. BIANCAMANO for FRANCISCO LANDEROS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION as to FRANCISCO LANDEROS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by FRANCISCO LANDEROS (executed on the record). (seb)
Related: [-]
11 11 BRADY ORDER as to FRANCISCO LANDEROS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark:Initial Appearance as to ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO held on 5/27/2021. Defendant advised of rights. CJA appointed. Defendant consents to detention with the right to make a bail application at a later time. (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom.) (seb)
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 20 as to ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO: Appointment of Attorney LORRAINE S. GAULI-RUFO for ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION as to ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO (executed on the record). (seb)
Related: [-]
16 16 BRADY ORDER as to ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to JOEL VASQUEZ Time excluded from 5/27/2021 until 8/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ALAN VILLARREAL ROMERO Time excluded from 5/27/2021 until 8/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to FRANCISCO LANDEROS Time excluded from 5/27/2021 until 8/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/27/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]