Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:S Thomas Anderson
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 1:21-cv-01098
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 25, 2021 2:47 AM CST
Defendant
Jimmy Sain
Individually and in his capacity as Mayor of Hardeman County, Tennessee 100 North Main Street
Bolivar, TN 38008
Represented By
Michael T. Schmitt
Ortale Kelley Herbert & Crawford
contact info
Defendant
Hardeman County, Tennessee, Government
Represented By
Michael T. Schmitt
Ortale Kelley Herbert & Crawford
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Allen
Represented By
William C. Sessions, III
Sessions Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Allen
Represented By
William C. Sessions, III
Sessions Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Bryant
1555 Forrest Hill Road
Bolivar, TN 38008
Represented By
William C. Sessions, III
Sessions Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Hill
Represented By
William C. Sessions, III
Sessions Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Luttrell
Represented By
William C. Sessions, III
Sessions Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Deitrick Mason
Represented By
William C. Sessions, III
Sessions Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick D. Perry
150 Breezewood Lane
Pocahontas, TN 38061
Represented By
William C. Sessions, III
Sessions Law Firm, PLLC
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2021
ORDER DISMISSING REDUNDANT CASES AND ENDING CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/6/21. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.(skc)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 06, 2021
25 25 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 12/06 11:54 AM
ORDER DISMISSING REDUNDANT CASES AND ENDING CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/6/21. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.(skc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
24 24 notice Courtesy Notice Thu 12/02 4:20 PM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document AMENDED COMPLAINT (23 in 1:21-cv-01098-STA-cgc), (35 in 1:21-cv-01087-STA-cgc), (53 in 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc), (228 in 1:19-cv-01106-STA-cgc), (35 in 1:20-cv-01109-STA-cgc)has been filed. For future reference, please note: ALL DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE NO. 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc. All documents should reflect the lead case number first, followed by the case number(s) of the member cases for which the pleading relates. Counsel shall file all documents in the lead case and spread the docket filing text to the consolidation member cases as applicable instead of filing the documents individually in each case. You will get text similar to this when the document has been spread to the applicable cases: "Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.". Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.(skc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/01 7:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sessions, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 11/19 3:36 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED MASTER COMPLAINT (225 in 1:19-cv-01106-STA-cgc). Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/19/21. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc, 1:19-cv-01106-STA-cgc, 1:21-cv-01087-STA-cgc, 1:21-cv-01098-STA-cgc(skc)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 11/19 11:54 AM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED MASTER COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/19/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.(mbm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
20 20 notice Courtesy Notice Mon 10/25 7:51 AM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document (218 in 1:19-cv-01106-STA-cgc) MOTION TO HAVE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, ONLY, ATTEND MEDIATION filed by Hardeman County Commission, Hardeman County Goverment, (45 in 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc) MOTION MOTION TO HAVE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, ONLY, ATTEND MEDIATION filed by Hardeman County Government has been filed. For future reference, please note: ALL DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE NO. 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc. All documents should reflect the lead case number first, followed by the case number(s) of the member cases for which the pleading relates. Counsel shall file all documents in the lead case and spread the docket filing text to the consolidation member cases as applicable instead of filing the documents individually in each case. You will get text similar to this when the document has been spread to the applicable cases: "Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al." . Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. ALL COUNSEL, please be sure to file future documents in compliance with this notice. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.(cdi)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/22 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Starling Moore on behalf of John Doolen Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.(Moore, Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
18 18 minutes Status Conference Thu 10/07 3:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton: Status Conference held on 10/7/2021. Counsel for the parties present via video. The Court discussed setting the Judicial Mediation. The parties requested to be able to brief the Court on the structure of the Mediation. Defendant's brief 10/22/2021 with Plaintiff's response due 11/5/2021. Judicial Conference set for 1/18/2022 - 1/24/2022. (Plaintiffs Counsel: Wm. Sessions. Defendants Counsel: S. Hale & A. Shaw.) (Tape #Teams) (cas)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 10/07 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 10/7/2021. Parties addressed the Court. Master Scheduling Order (DE# 41-1) discussed. Counsel to confer and come up with a proposal within 10 days (following Monday.) Counsel to submit report to chambers on where they are with agreements and other remaining issues. Counsel to submit final proposed scheduling order to chambers with in 10 days (following Monday.) PRESENT: William Sessions for plaintiff. Michael Schmitt, Amber Shaw for defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.(mbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
16 16 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/05 5:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE Related [+]. Case No. 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc shall be the lead case in the case consolidation. All documents should reflect the lead case number first, followed by the case number(s) of the member cases for which the pleading relates. Counsel shall file all documents in the lead case and spread the docket filing text to the consolidation member cases as applicable. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/5/21. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-02179-STA-cgc et al.(cdi)
Related: [-] 27 in 1:21-cv-01087-STA-cgc and 213 in 1:19-cv-01106-STA-cgc
Thursday, September 23, 2021
15 15 notice Setting Letter - Teams Thu 09/23 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF SETTING: A STATUS CONFERENCE has been set for THURSDAY, 10/7/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Chris Sowell at chris_sowell@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01098-STA-cgc, 1:19-cv-01106-STA-cgc, 1:21-cv-01087-STA-cgc(bvh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order of Reference of Settlement Conference Mon 09/20 10:47 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE FOR JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/20/21. (skc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
13 13 notice Setting Letter Wed 09/15 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF RESETTING: IN PERSON Scheduling Conference reset for 10/7/2021 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
12 12 notice Setting Letter Wed 08/25 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF RESETTING: IN PERSON Scheduling Conference reset for 9/20/2021 02:30 PM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/20 2:53 PM
NOTICE by Brandon Allen, Cheri Baker, Justiin Bryant, Jenny Duke, Crystal Ervin, Lauren Hampton, Jackie Kelley, Pearlie Long, Martha Lowrance, Cody Naylor, Patrick Perry, Toni Pierce, Cathie Sprayberry, Jane Vickers, Alisha Young, Joshua Allen, Quinterius Allen, Tavishia Anderson, Elvis Armour, Thomas Avery, Ashley Banks, Lindsey Bolton, Billy Bricker, Greg Brown, Leonard Brown, Nickie N. Brown, Scott Brown, Justin Bryant, James Callahan, Lauren A. Chism, Gloria Coble, Matthew Craig Collins, Martha Daniel, Christopher Deming, Jackie Edwards, Nicholas Ellison, Wesley Estes, James Frazier, Christy Garnier, James Graham, Randle Grantham, Jocelyn Hall, Christopher Hannis, Michael Hatch, Ryan Herndon, Cristen L. Hill, Jeffrey Hill, Kenneth Hogwood, Chris Hopkins, Courtney Howell, Ethan Howell, Logan Howell, Tina L. Howell, Vincent Hunt, Gerald Jacobs, Jacqueline Kelley, Michael Kennamore, Chasity Lewis, Woodson C. Long, Chasity Mathews, Jason McCord, Carol Danford McElhone, Chris McKinney, Brandon McKinnie, Jaime Medina, Greg Moore, David Nabors, Thomas Cody Naylor, Cherterica Neal, Curtavious Neal, Sharnett Neal, Parris Parks, Antron Parram, Tia Peoples, Patrick D. Perry, Devante Phinnessee, Gina Pittman, Fonta Polk, Latrece Robinson, Victoria Rouse, Arthur Schultz, Keviante Simmons, Trina Smith, Megan Sterling, Brian Vandiver, Ethan Vasquez, Martha Jane Vickers, Timothy Welch, Judy Wiggins, Chris Wilkerson, Stephanie Wilson, Chadriques Wooden, Tommie Woods, Alisha Young, Jonathan Luttrell, Deitrick Mason of Attorney Lien Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01106-STA-cgc, 1:21-cv-01087-STA-cgc, 1:21-cv-01098-STA-cgc(Moore, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
10 10 notice Setting Letter Fri 08/13 11:50 AM
SETTING LETTER: IN PERSON Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2021 09:15 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/20 1:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hardeman County, Tennessee, Government, Jimmy Sain.(Schmitt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Private Acts of Hardeman County
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/06 1:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Luttrell as to Jimmy Sain. (Sessions, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/02 12:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Luttrell as to Hardeman County, Tennessee, Government. (Sessions, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 06/29 11:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Hardeman County, Tennessee, Government, and Jimmy Sain. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service.(skc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons J. Sain
Monday, June 28, 2021
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 06/29 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ADR Compliance Tue 06/29 11:31 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice LR 16.2 Tue 06/29 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 06/29 11:24 AM
Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (skc) (jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/29/2021) Magistrate Judicial Card
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/28 6:36 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sessions, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit