Georgia Southern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00124
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2021
Terminated:Jan 18, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 29, 2021 3:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Jason McMillan (1)
36 E. Broad Street Unit 5
Savannah, GA 31401
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Karl Irving Knoche
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Savannah
contact info
Steven H. Lee
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Savannah
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/19/2022 6:39 AM EST
Monday, June 28, 2021
1 1 4 pgs INFORMATION as to Jason McMillan (1) count 1. (loh)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs PENALTY CERTIFICATION by Government as to Jason McMillan. (loh)
Related: [-]