Original Case: 2:21-cv-02040

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-01559
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2021
Terminated:Sep 01, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Sep 02, 2021 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Martha A. Lees, as General Counsel of the Department of Financial Services
Defendant
Martin Schwartzman
Defendant
Stella M. Vilardi
Defendant
Raphael A. Weitzner
Defendant
Ira S. Lipsius
Defendant
Lipsius-Benhaim Law, LLP
Defendant
Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP
Defendant
Cullen and Dykman, LLP
Defendant
John Doe, and other persons not yet identified
Defendant
Andrew Cuomo, as the Governor of the State of New York
Defendant
Linda A. Lacewell, as Superintendent of Insurance of the State of New York Department of Financial Services
Defendant
Avalon Gardens Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC
Defendant
Roberta Reardon, as the Commissioner of the State of New York Department of Labor
Defendant
Carolyn Robinson, Supervisor with the New York State Department of Labor
Defendant
Dr. Merryl H. Tisch, Chairman of the State University of New York Board of Trustees
Defendant
State University of New York
Defendant
Scott Dietrich
Defendant
Peter Fountas, of the Research Foundation of the State University of New York
Defendant
Howard Zucker, as the Commissioner of the State of New York Department of Health
Defendant
Oriska Insurance Company, as its interest may appear
Defendant
Rashbi Management, Inc., as its interest may appear
Defendant
Isaac Muller
Defendant
Bent Phillipson
Defendant
Benjamin Landa
Defendant
Alan Chopp
Defendant
Pitterman Family Trust
Defendant
The Schlesinger Family Trust
Defendant
Berkshire Group, Inc.
Defendant
Spencer Street Realty
Defendant
Sam Schlesinger
Defendant
National Financial Service
Defendant
Financial Service
Defendant
Allstate ASO, Inc.
Defendant
Allstate Administrators, Inc.
Defendant
Michael Camilleri
Defendant
Wolf Eisenbach
Defendant
Israel Ziegelman
Defendant
Michael Schweimmer
Defendant
Grandview Brokerage, Inc.
Defendant
Broad Coverage Services, Inc.
Defendant
Sentosacare, LLC
Defendant - Appellant
Donna Hodge
Represented By
James M. Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Annette Hall
Represented By
James M. Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Karen Grant Williams
Represented By
James M. Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Alexi Arias, as the Class Representatives of a Class of Employees of Employer Defendants as the interests of the Class may appear
Represented By
James M. Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Oriska Corporation, individually and derivatively to Carrier-Defendant Oriska Insurance Company
Represented By
Frank Policelli
Frank Policelli Attorney at Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/02/2021 4:31 AM EDT
Friday, June 25, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Alexi Arias, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge and Karen Grant Williams, FILED. [3127467] 21-1559 [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:14 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 34 pgs Case FILED
2 2 27 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 05/27/2021, RECEIVED.[3127474] 21-1559 [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:17 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/28/2021, RECEIVED.[3127476] 21-1559 [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:18 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Alexi Arias, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge and Karen Grant Williams, district court receipt # ANYEDC-14600376, FILED.[3127477] 21-1559 [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:19 PM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3127480] 21-1559 [Entered: 06/28/2021 01:20 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED