Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Leo T Sorokin
Case #: 1:21-cv-11081
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2021
Terminated:May 03, 2022
Last checked: Monday Dec 27, 2021 3:44 AM EST
Defendant
Global Lending Services, LLC
Represented By
Rene M. Pickett
Melick & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant
JMAC Distribution, LLC
Represented By
Rene M. Pickett
Melick & Porter, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation
Represented By
Rene M. Pickett
Melick & Porter, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Yerdon
Represented By
Kevin V.K. Crick
Rights Protection Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Yitzchak Zelman
Marcus & Zelman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 16, 2022
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/16 3:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to all Defendants by Susan Yerdon.(Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Dismissal Order
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
29 29 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Tue 05/03 12:04 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL & CLOSING ORDER (Dore, Samantha) (Main Document 29 replaced on 5/3/2022) (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 05/03 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as to all Defendants and request for 60 days to file dismissal documents by Susan Yerdon (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
notice Notice of Rescheduling Mon 04/25 11:03 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Status Conference reset for 5/4/2022 04:15 PM in Courtroom 13 Related [+] before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Belmont, Kellyann)
Related: [-] mote only
Friday, March 04, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/04 10:20 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 4, 2022 to Scheduling Order Deadlines and Status Conference. ALLOWED. Status Conference Reset for 5/5/2022 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13 Related [+] before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Belmont, Kellyann)
Related: [-] mote only
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 03/04 10:24 AM
Reset Deadlines: All depositions, other than expert depositions, completed by 4/29/2022, Dispositive Motions filed by 5/30/2022, Oppositions to dispositive motions filed by 6/29/2022. (Belmont, Kellyann)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
24 24 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/03 1:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to May 4, 2022 to Scheduling Order Deadlines and Status Conference by Global Lending Services, LLC, JMAC Distribution, LLC, Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation.(Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
23 23 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 12/23 12:04 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered re:21 Assented to MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
22 22 8 pgs motion Order Wed 12/22 4:00 PM
Proposed MOTION for Order to Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement by Global Lending Services, LLC, JMAC Distribution, LLC, Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation.(Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Protective Order Wed 12/22 3:50 PM
Assented to MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement by Global Lending Services, LLC, JMAC Distribution, LLC, Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation.(Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
19 19 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Wed 12/08 3:47 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of JMAC . (Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/13 2:19 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Data Search NY for Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation.. (Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/13 2:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Lending Services, LLC. (Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/13 2:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JMAC Distribution, LLC. (Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
15 15 3 pgs order Order Thu 09/09 12:42 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered: re14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The Court ADOPTS the schedule jointly proposed by the parties as the governing schedule and, at the joint request of the parties, CANCELS the in person Rule 16 conference. (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/09 12:40 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ( Status Conference set for 3/23/2022 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.) (Dore, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Fri 09/03 3:59 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Fri 08/20 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 9/15/2021 02:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 scheduling order sample,
Att: 2 standing order on summary judgment
12 12 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/20 10:39 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: New Civil Cases Procedural ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/19 3:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by JMAC Distribution, LLC.(Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/19 3:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Global Lending Services, LLC.(Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/19 3:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation.(Pickett, Rene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/05 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed JMAC Distribution, LLC served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/23 2:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Global Lending Services, LLC served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/20 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 07/09 11:44 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Yitzchak Zelman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/08 3:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8850449 by Susan Yerdon.(Crick, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 06/30 12:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Global Lending Services, LLC, JMAC Distribution, LLC, Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 06/30 12:24 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/30 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Global Lending Services, LLC, Millennium Capital and Recovery Corporation, JMAC Distribution, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8840785 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Susan Yerdon.(Crick, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form