Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Referred: N Reid Neureiter
Case #: 1:21-cv-01781
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2021
Terminated:Apr 11, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Dec 26, 2021 2:55 AM MST
Defendant
Universal Health Services
Represented By
Jon Jay Olafson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp-Denver
contact info
Brian Robert DeMocker
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital
2135 Southgate Road
Colorado Springs, CO 80906
Represented By
Jon Jay Olafson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp-Denver
contact info
Brian Robert DeMocker
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp-Denver
contact info
Plaintiff
Garret Goff
[Pro Se E-Filer, effective 7/9/2021] 1206 Affirmed View Apartment 206
Colorado Springs, CO 80921
TERMINATED PARTIES
Consol Defendant
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
Terminated: 07/30/2021
Defendant Legal Counsel (3rd Party Law Firm - Lewis Brisbois) 1700 Lincoln St Suite 400
Denver, CO 80203


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 11, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/11 4:19 PM
ORDER re: Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Each party will bear their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/11/2022. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Wed 04/06 4:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Defendants Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital, Universal Health Services. (DeMocker, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/30 1:27 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 30 March 2022. In light of the Notice of Settlement (Dkt. #33 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. ##19 &20 ) are DENIED as moot, and the Motion Hearing set for April 25, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that dismissal papers are due on or before April 29, 2022. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 03/30 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Defendants Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital, Universal Health Services, Consol Defendant Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Olafson, Jon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
32 32 2 pgs minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/17 1:56 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/17/2022. Discovery is hereby STAYED pending a determination on the Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. #'s 19 and 20). Plaintiff shall respond to the Motions to Dismiss by April 1, 2022. Defendants shall reply by April 15, 2022. A Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for April 25, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The Court will hear arguments on the Motions to Dismiss at that time. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
31 31 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/15 1:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Olafson, Jon)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/15 1:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Olafson, Jon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Order Tue 02/01 2:25 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1 February 2022. This case is before the Court on review of the docket. It is hereby ORDERED that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for February 17, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Tue 02/01 11:24 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Due to Magistrate Judge Tafoya's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter as the referral judge. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Neureiter at the end of the civil action number (such as 21-cv-01781-RMR-NRN). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all scheduled matters will be maintained. (Text only entry). (csarr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
order Memorandum Mon 01/24 8:53 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Universal Health Services,20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 1/24/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/19 10:22 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 1/19/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
24 24 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 01/18 4:44 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital, Universal Health Services. (DeMocker, Brian)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Tue 01/18 4:43 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital, Universal Health Services All parties do not consent.. (DeMocker, Brian)
Related: [-]
misc Letter Reassigning Case Wed 01/19 9:13 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to23 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01781-RMR. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 12/01 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon Jay Olafson on behalf of Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital, Universal Health ServicesAttorney Jon Jay Olafson added to party Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital(pty:dft), Attorney Jon Jay Olafson added to party Universal Health Services(pty:dft) (Olafson, Jon)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
21 21 3 pgs order Order Mon 11/29 10:32 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 1/18/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/18/2022. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/29/2021. (evaug )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 11/26 2:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Cedar Springs Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Cedar Springs Hospital.(DeMocker, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
19 19 motion Dismiss Fri 11/26 1:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Universal Health Services.(DeMocker, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Monday, November 15, 2021
18 18 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 11/16 10:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Universal Health Services served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/25/2021.(csarr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 receipt and return
Thursday, October 21, 2021
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re14 Amended Complaint for service of process. (csarr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS Service forms
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
16 16 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Wed 10/20 2:17 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 10/20 2:04 PM
ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/20/2021. This Case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01781-KMT .. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/15 4:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT AMENDED against All Defendants, filed by Garret Goff.(Goff, Garret)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Thu 09/16 11:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/15/2021, re:12 Plaintiffs motion, requesting an extension of time to file an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint, is GRANTED . Plaintiff shall file an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint as directed in the Courts order to amend on or before October 15, 2021 . Plaintiff is reminded that this action may be dismissed without further notice if he fails to file an amended complaint as directed within the time allowed. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
12 12 4 pgs motion Order Tue 09/14 7:14 PM
First MOTION for Order to REQUEST EXTENSION / CONTINUANCE ON RESPONSE by Plaintiff Garret Goff. (Goff, Garret)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
11 11 adr Consent to Arbitration Fri 08/27 6:51 PM
CONSENT to Arbitration by Garret Goff(Goff, Garret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document EMPLOYER FAILED TO PAY 2ND NOTICE
Sunday, August 15, 2021
10 10 10 pgs order Order Mon 08/16 7:57 AM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this order . If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/15/2021. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 08/11 2:03 PM
ORDER Granting2 the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/11/2021.(sphil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
8 8 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Mon 08/09 11:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Garret Goff, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP served on 8/9/2021, answer due 8/30/2021.(Goff, Garret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof (email correspondence)
Thursday, July 29, 2021
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/29 10:30 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Exhibits Continued) GOFF against Universal Health Services, filed by Garret Goff.(Goff, Garret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit SMS Logs Jodi M. & Goff,
Att: 2 Exhibit CCRD Jodi M. Interview,
Att: 3 Exhibit CCRD Robert T. Interview,
Att: 4 Exhibit CCRD Kathleen N. Interview,
Att: 5 Exhibit CCRD Garrett G. Interview,
Att: 6 Exhibit Therapy Medical Report
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/29 9:03 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT GARRETT GOFF against Universal Health Services, filed by Garret Goff.(Goff, Garret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document Employment Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit CCRD Letter of Determination,
Att: 3 Exhibit EEOC RTS Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit CCRD Case File Communication with UHS
Thursday, July 01, 2021
4 4 3 pgs order Order Thu 07/01 9:52 AM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order , the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/30/2021. (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Thu 07/01 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Garret Goff (sphil, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 06/30 10:41 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 06/30 10:38 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Garret Goff. (jsalz, )
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/30 10:37 AM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Trial By Jury against Universal Health Services, filed by Garret Goff.(jsalz, )
Related: [-]