Simpson-Vlach et al v. Michigan Department of Education et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Judith E Levy |
Referred: | Anthony P Patti |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-11532 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 27, 2021 3:24 AM EST |
Defendant
Ann Arbor Public Schools
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Marianne Fidishin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott A. Menzel
9450 Sandlewood Ct.
Whitmore Lake, MI 48189 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michigan Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Naomi Norman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael F. Rice
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Jeanice Kerr Swift
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Washtenaw Intermediate School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Bishop
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Place
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Simpson-Vlach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rita C. Simpson-Vlach
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
81 | 81
appeal
Appeal/Supreme Court Letter
Wed 02/21 11:03 AM
LETTER from the US Supreme Court denying the petition for writ of certiorari [Supreme Court Case Number: 23-507] [Court of Appeals Case Number: 22-1724 (TTho) |