INEOS AUTOMOTIVE LIMITED v. JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Farbiarz |
Referred: | James B Clark |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-13174 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 16, 2022 6:20 PM EST |
Defendant
JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Notice Only
KATHERINE M. BASTIAN
|
|
Notice Only
DAVID DONAHUE
|
|
Notice Only
JESSICA L. ELLSWORTH
|
|
Notice Only
HARRISON GRAY KILGORE
|
|
Notice Only
PHV DANIEL M. NUZZACI
|
|
Notice Only
LAURA POPP-ROSENBERG
|
|
Notice Only
BRENDAN C. QUINN
|
|
Notice Only
PHV ANNA KURIAN SHAW
|
|
Plaintiff
INEOS AUTOMOTIVE LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
73 | 73
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/30 4:37 PM
LETTER ORDER granting72 Defendant's request for a further extension to respond to Plaintiff's pre-motion letter, until 6/30/2024 and No further Extensions. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/30/2024. (jd, ) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
72 | 72
misc
Letter
Mon 04/29 3:39 PM
Letter from Jason M. Russell requesting a further extension, until June 30, 2024, to respond to Plaintiff's pre-motion letter requesting permission to file a motion to compel re61 Letter. (RUSSELL, JASON) |