New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alison J Nathan
Referred: Ona T Wang
Case #: 1:21-cv-05532
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2021
Terminated:Aug 09, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 21, 2021 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
Manhattan District Attorneys Office
Defendant
Amanda White
Represented By
Shi-Shi Wang
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Judge Wasko
Represented By
Shi-Shi Wang
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Sun River Health, Inc.
Defendant
Zulma Montanez
Defendant
(Office of Children & Family Services, OCPS) John Udochi
Represented By
Shi-Shi Wang
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
James Zaleta
Defendant
Iyeisha Witherspoon
Defendant
Jacqueline D. Williams
Represented By
Shi-Shi Wang
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Judith Stern
Represented By
Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter LLP
contact info
Joseph Paul Muscarella
contact info
Defendant
Janet Sabel
Represented By
Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter LLP
contact info
Joseph Paul Muscarella
contact info
Defendant
NYPD
Defendant
NYC Department of Investigation
Represented By
Brian Joseph Krist
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Laura Millendorf
Defendant
Robert Maes
Defendant
Legal Aid Society
Represented By
Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter LLP
contact info
Joseph Paul Muscarella
contact info
Defendant
Travis Johnson
Represented By
Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter LLP
contact info
Joseph Paul Muscarella
contact info
Defendant
Margaret Ingoglia
Defendant
Octavia Hill
Defendant
Melissa Hayes
Defendant
David Hansell
Defendant
Nicola Gibson
Defendant
Paula Garcia
Defendant
Jennifer Fiellman
Defendant
Rosmil Almonte
Defendant
ACS
Represented By
Brian Joseph Krist
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Malek
2609 East 14th Street #304
Brooklyn, NY 11235
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Janie Groff
Terminated: 07/09/2021


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
30 30 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Thu 09/09 8:15 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Robert M. Malek consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Robert Malek.(sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
29 29 7 pgs order Order Tue 08/31 10:59 AM
ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiff's motions to reopen and "pause" this action, Dkt. Nos. 26-27, are denied. This action, which was dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's refiling it, remains closed. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/31/2021) (vfr) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 8/31/2021 (vfr). (Main Document 29 replaced on 8/31/2021) (vfr)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by USPS Tue 08/31 2:07 PM
Mailed a copy of29 Order to Robert Malek at 2609 East 14th Street, #304, Brooklyn, NY 11235. (kh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
28 28 misc Remark Mon 08/30 10:39 AM
ADDITIONAL REMARKS UPON CASES 21CV5532 & 21CV6381. Document filed by Robert Malek. (sc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
27 27 misc Remark Mon 08/23 12:14 PM
PAUSING REQUEST TO REINSTATE PENDING CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION & ONGOING HEALTH ISSUES. Document filed by Robert Malek. (sc)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Remark Mon 08/23 8:42 AM
REQUEST TO REINSTATE PURSUANT TO 60 B (6). Document filed by Robert Malek. (ok)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 Supplement
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
9 9 misc Letter Wed 07/28 3:16 PM
LETTER from R. Malek to Court, dated 7/28/21, re: Regarding service which was provided by Victoria Navarro and Anthony Cibelli, both non-parties to the action and over the age of 18: 1.)Acs 150 Williams informed Malek not to serve by hardcopy. Email to Ana Rodriguez and Oren Pena. 2.) Brian Krist acs lawyer will not respond as to which acs workers he is representing. 3.) Rosmil Almone emailed Malek that I should serve Krist etc. Document filed by Robert Malek.(sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/28 10:28 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. ACS served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service was made by email to Administration for Children's Services c/o Ana Rodriguez. Document filed by Robert Malek. (sc)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/27 10:04 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Octavia Hill served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Legal Aid Society served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; NYC Department of Investigation served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Janet Sabel served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Judith Stern served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Sun River Health, Inc. served on 7/24/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service was accepted by Ferdinand Cesarano o/b/o Janet Sabel, Legal Aid Society, and Judith Stern; Javilee Francis o/b/o NYC Dept. of Investigation and Javilee Hill; and no name given to person accepting service for Sun River Health Inc. Document filed by Robert Malek. (sc) (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/27/2021) Proof of Sevice
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 07/21 2:25 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACS, Rosmil Almonte, Brooklyn Defender Services, Jennifer Fiellman, Paula Garcia, Nicola Gibson, Janie Groff, David Hansell, Melissa Hayes, Octavia Hill, Margaret Ingoglia, Travis Johnson, Legal Aid Society, Robert Maes, Manhattan District Attorneys Office, Laura Millendorf, Zulma Montanez, NYC Department of Investigation, NYPD, Janet Sabel, Judith Stern, Sun River Health, Inc., John Udochi, Sue Novick Wasko, Amanda White, Jacqueline D. Williams, Iyeisha Witherspoon, James Zaleta. (sha)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/12 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Joseph Krist on behalf of ACS, NYC Department of Investigation..(Krist, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/09 4:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending1 Complaint, against ACS, Rosmil Almonte, Jennifer Fiellman, Paula Garcia, Nicola Gibson, David Hansell, Melissa Hayes, Octavia Hill, Margaret Ingoglia, Travis Johnson, Legal Aid Society, Robert Maes, Manhattan District Attorneys Office, Laura Millendorf, NYC Department of Investigation, NYPD, Janet Sabel, Judith Stern, Sun River Health, Inc., Jacqueline D. Williams, Iyeisha Witherspoon, James Zaleta.Document filed by Robert Malek. Related document:1 Complaint.(sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 06/30 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Nelson Stephen Roman is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
Related: [-]
utility Case Redesignation Wed 06/30 12:12 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so redesignated. (aea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT against ACS, Rosmil Almonte, Jennifer Fiellman, Paula Garcia, Nicola Gibson, Janie Groff, David Hansell, Melissa Hayes, Octavia Hill, Margaret Ingoglia, Travis Johnson, Legal Aid Society, Robert Maes, Manhattan District Attorneys Office, Laura Millendorf, NYC Department of Investigation, NYPD, Janet Sabel, Judith Stern, Sun River Health, Jacqueline D. Williams, Iyeisha Witherspoon, James Zaleta. (Filing Fee $402.00 Fee Paid.) Document filed by Robert Malek. (sac)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sac)
Related: [-]