Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Donna Phillips Currault
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:21-cv-01262
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2021
Terminated:Feb 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 22, 2022 1:47 AM CDT
Defendant
W Farrell
Defendant
Warren Farrell
Represented By
Vincent F. Wynne, Jr.
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Shannon K. Lowry
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Richard Gary Higgins
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Ham
Defendant
Jose Ham
Represented By
James T. Rivera
Scofield & Rivera, LLC
contact info
Jessica Wimberley Marchand
Scofield & Rivera, LLC
contact info
Bryan David Scofield
Scofield & Rivera, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Captain Kelly
Defendant
Lacey Kelly
Represented By
Vincent F. Wynne, Jr.
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Shannon K. Lowry
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Richard Gary Higgins
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Defendant
Jonathon Porter
Defendant
Randy Smith
Represented By
Vincent F. Wynne, Jr.
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Shannon K. Lowry
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Richard Gary Higgins
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Defendant
Captain Weary
Defendant
Shaniqueka Weary
Represented By
Vincent F. Wynne, Jr.
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Shannon K. Lowry
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Richard Gary Higgins
Wynne, Goux & Lobello, Llc (covington)
contact info
Plaintiff
Wesley D. Pierce
24691 Setton Road
Livingston, LA 70754

GPO Jun 06 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wesley D. Pierce, 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jose Ham, 3 Complaint filed by Wesley D. Pierce. It is therefore RECOMMENDED that Wesley D. Pierce's § 1983 claims against defendants Dr. Jose Ham, Captain Lacey Kelly, Sheriff Randy Smith, Deputy Warren Farrell, Captain Shaniqueka Weary, Lt. Chatelain, Deputy Johnathan Lott, Sgt. Robin, Deputy Widdle, Lt. Fayard, Deputy Dussoy, Deputy Foto, Sergeant Harris, Corporal Glover, Deputy Racheal Smith, Corporal Pelligrin, and Sergeant John Doe be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e), § 1915A and 42 U.S.C. § 1997e as frivolous and for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted. It is further RECOMMENDED that Pierce's 25 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order be DENIED. It is further RECOMMENDED that Dr. Ham's 28 Motion to Dismiss/for Summary Judgment be DENIED AS MOOT. It is further RECOMMENDED that Pierce's § 1983 claims of excessive force and cruel and unusual punishment against defendant Jonathan Porter arising from the alleged sexual assaults occurring within the St. Tammany Parish Jail between December 2019 and October 2020 be allowed to proceed and remain referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge for further pretrial proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 6/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/6/2022.(cwa)
GPO Jun 24 2022
ORDER ADOPTING 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Wesley D. Pierce's 42 U.S.C. 1983 claims against defendants Dr. Jose Ham, Captain Lacey Kelly, Sheriff Randy Smith, Deputy Warren Farrell, Captain Shaniqueka Weary, Lt. Chatelain, Deputy Johnathan Lott, Sergeant Robin, Deputy Widdle, Lt. Fayard, Deputy Dussoy, Deputy Foto, Sergeant Harris, Corporal Glover, Deputy Racheal Smith, Corporal Pelligrin, and Sergeant John Doe are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, as stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pierce's motion for temporary restraining order 25 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Dr. Ham's motion to dismiss, or alternatively, for summary judgment 28 is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 06/24/2022.(am) (NEF to Mag. Case Manager).
GPO Jun 08 2023
ORDER AND REASONS denying 73 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/8/2023. (rt)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
98 98 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reimbursement of Civil Pro Bono Panel Costs Mon 06/24 2:17 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the97 Motion for Reimbursement of Costs is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is authorized to issue the law firm Kenneth C.Bordes, Attorney at Law, LLC reimbursement from the Attorney Registration and Disciplinary Fund in the amount of $1,526.00, to be paid on or before August 24, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/24/2024. (alm) (CC: Clerk, Financial, ProBono) Modified text on 6/24/2024 (alm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
97 97 motion Reimbursement of Civil Pro Bono Panel Costs Fri 06/21 1:47 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Motion for Reimbursement of Civil Pro Bono Panel Costs by Wesley D. Pierce.(Bordes, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit