Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:21-cv-00973
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2021
Terminated:Jul 30, 2021

Debtor
Nine Point Energy Holdings, Inc.

,
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 28, 2021 3:34 AM EST
Appellant
Caliber Measurement Services LLC
Represented By
Nader A. Amer
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Nader Amro Amer
Business Reorganization & Restructuring
contact info
Maggie B. Burrus
contact info
Taylor Maryko Haga
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Curtis S. Miller
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Kevin Barrett
contact info
Appellant
Caliber Midstream Fresh Water Partners LLC
Represented By
Nader A. Amer
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Nader Amro Amer
Business Reorganization & Restructuring
contact info
Maggie B. Burrus
contact info
Taylor Maryko Haga
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Curtis S. Miller
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Kevin Barrett
contact info
Appellant
Caliber North Dakota LLC
Represented By
Nader A. Amer
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Nader Amro Amer
Business Reorganization & Restructuring
contact info
Maggie B. Burrus
contact info
Taylor Maryko Haga
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Curtis S. Miller
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Kevin Barrett
contact info
Appellee
AB Private Credit Investors, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Robert Pierce
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Kerri K. Mumford
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Appellee
Nine Point Energy Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Sean Neiburg
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Kara Hammond Coyle
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Michael R. Nestor
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 30 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/30/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00972-RGA, 1:21-cv-00973-RGA, 1:21-cv-00974-RGA, 1:21-cv-00975-RGA, 1:21-cv-00976-RGA (lak)
GPO Aug 04 2021
MEMORANDUM regarding second Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2021. (nms)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 09, 2021
67 67 appeal USCA Order Terminating Appeal Thu 09/09 11:53 AM
USCA Order Terminating Appeal as to63 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Caliber Midstream Fresh Water Partners LLC, Caliber North Dakota LLC, Caliber Measurement Services LLC. USCA Decision: Dismissed. (pb, )
Related: [-]
66 66 appeal - - Notice of Docketing ROA - 3rd Circuit Thu 09/09 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re63 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit) filed by Caliber Midstream Fresh Water Partners LLC, Caliber North Dakota LLC, Caliber Measurement Services LLC. USCA Case Number 21-2462 USCA Case Manager: Pamela (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (pb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
65 65 appeal Designation of Record on Appeal Thu 09/02 10:13 AM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal, by Nine Point Energy Holdings, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) Modified on 9/2/2021 (nms)
Related: [-]