Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00358
Case Filed:Jun 29, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jul 02, 2021 2:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Joseph L Robinson (1)
Represented By
Jasmine J. Johnson
Federal Defender Program
contact info
James Arthur McGurk
Law Offices Of James A. Mcgurk, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Pretrial Services
contact info
Thomas P Peabody
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/02/2021 3:28 AM CDT
Thursday, June 03, 2021
1 1 20 pgs COMPLAINT signed by Honorable Beth W. Jantz as to Joseph L Robinson (1). (td, )
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION by USA to seal complaint, affidavit, and arrest warrant as to Joseph L Robinson. (td, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER as to Joseph L Robinson: Arrest warrant issued to Special Agent, Federal Bureau of Investigation as to Joseph L. Robinson on 06/03/2021. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 6/3/2021. (td, )
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER as to Joseph L Robinson. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 6/3/2021. (td, )
Related: [-]
5 5 ARREST WARRANT issued to U.S. Marshal as to Joseph L Robinson. (td, )
Related: [-]
6 6 SEALED MOTION by USA as to Joseph L Robinson. (td, )
Related: [-]
7 7 SEALED ORDER as to Joseph L Robinson: Sealed motion6 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 6/3/2021. (td, )
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED Document. (td, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Friday, June 04, 2021
ORAL MOTION by USA to unseal case as to Joseph L Robinson (ec, )
Related: [-]
ARREST of defendant Joseph L Robinson (ec, )
Related: [-]
10 10 ORAL MOTION by USA for pretrial detention as to Joseph L Robinson (ec, )
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Joseph L Robinson: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant appears in response to arrest on 06/04/2021. By agreement and consent of all the parties and pursuant to the CARES Act, all parties appear telephonically. Defendant informed of his rights. Attorney, Jasmine Johnson of the Federal Defender Program is appointed as counsel for defendant. Defendant informed of the charges against him. Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P 5(f)(1), the Court confirmed the continuing obligation of the United States to disclose information favorable to the defendant as to guilt or punishment, and possible consequences of non-disclosure. For further details, please see the attached written order. The Government's oral motion for pretrial detention is entered and continued to 06/09/2021 at 9:30 a.m. and will proceed telephonically. To join the call, counsel shall dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Also on 06/09/2021, defendant shall be prepared to inform the Court as to his position on a preliminary examination hearing. Defendant, Joseph R. Robinson is remanded into the custody of the United States Marshals Service and shall remain in custody until further order of the Court. The Government's oral motion to unseal the case with the exception of docket entries 5, 6, 7, and 8 is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to unseal document numbers 1, 2, 3 and 4 forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 6/4/2021. Mailed notice (ec, )
Related: [-]
12 12 CJA ORDER Appointing Counsel Jasmine J. Johnson Under the Criminal Justice Act as to Joseph L Robinson. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 6/1/2021. Mailed notice (ec, )
Related: [-]
13 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Joseph L Robinson by Jasmine J. Johnson (ec, )
Related: [-]
14 14 FINANCIAL Affidavit filed by Joseph L Robinson (SEALED) (ec, )
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5(f) as to Joseph L Robinson. Signed by the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes on 6/4/2021. Mailed notice (ec, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
9 9 PRETRIAL Bail Report as to Joseph L Robinson (SEALED) (Chapman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
16 16 ORDER as to Joseph L Robinson: Telephonic detention hearing held. By agreement and consent of all the parties and pursuant to the CARES Act, all parties appear telephonically. Defendant's oral motion for release is denied. Government's oral motion for pretrial detention is granted. Defendant shall remain in custody. Telephonic preliminary hearing set for 6/18/2021 at 1:00 p.m. To join the call, counsel shall dial 888-273-3658 and enter access code 2217918. Parties are to notify the Court on 6/17/2021 if the hearing is not moving forward. Detention order to follow. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 6/9/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Joseph L Robinson. Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 6/9/2021. Mailed notice (jn, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
18 18 WAIVER of PRELIMINARY HEARING by Joseph L Robinson (Johnson, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
19 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings:as to Joseph L Robinson: Defendant waives his right to a preliminary examination hearing18 . The Court enters a finding of probable cause and orders defendant bound to the District Court for further proceedings. Defendant shall remain in custody until further order of the Court. Preliminary hearing set for 6/18/21 is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (cc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
20 20 MOTION to withdraw as attorney as to Joseph L Robinson by Jasmine J. Johnson (Johnson, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
21 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Motion to withdraw as attorney20 is granted. Jasmine Johnson is terminated from the case. The Federal Defender Program is directed to request a CJA Panel attorney to appear on defendant Joseph Robinson's behalf. Mailed notice. (as, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
22 22 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Joseph L Robinson (1) count(s) 1 (jn, )
Related: [-]
24 24 DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 2). (jn, )
Related: [-]
25 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: No Bond Set; Detained by Magistrate Judge. Mailed notice (jn, )
Related: [-]