California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:21-cv-04872
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2021
Terminated:Nov 10, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 21, 2021 12:34 AM PST
Defendant
Norcal Nursery, LLC
Represented By
Kevin B. Piercy
Raimondo Associates Alc
contact info
Anthony P. Raimondo
Raimondo & Associates
contact info
James Daniel Miller
Raimondo And Associates Alc
contact info
Defendant
Planasa US Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Kevin B. Piercy
Raimondo Associates Alc
contact info
Anthony P. Raimondo
Raimondo & Associates
contact info
James Daniel Miller
Raimondo And Associates Alc
contact info
Defendant
Planasa, LLC
a Nevada Limited Liability Company
21008 Dersch Road, CA 96007
Represented By
Kevin B. Piercy
Raimondo Associates Alc
contact info
Anthony P. Raimondo
Raimondo & Associates
contact info
James Daniel Miller
Raimondo And Associates Alc
contact info
Defendant
Planasa-California Reo, LLC
Represented By
Kevin B. Piercy
Raimondo Associates Alc
contact info
Anthony P. Raimondo
Raimondo & Associates
contact info
James Daniel Miller
Raimondo And Associates Alc
contact info
Plaintiff
Alberto De La Rosa
Represented By
Jose Macias, Jr.
Macias Rodriguez Adams LLP
contact info
Travis Manning Adams
Macias Rodriguez Adams LLP
contact info
Hector J. Rodriguez
Macias Rodriguez Adams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Blas Trujillo
Represented By
Jose Macias, Jr.
Macias Rodriguez Adams LLP
contact info
Travis Manning Adams
Macias Rodriguez Adams LLP
contact info
Hector J. Rodriguez
Macias Rodriguez Adams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, November 29, 2021
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 11/30 11:27 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand Documents from the Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 11/12 10:30 AM
Clerks Notice Remanding Case to Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
12 12 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Wed 11/10 9:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND 7 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
oth_evt 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 08/17 8:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING SET FOR 8/31/2021 AT 2:00PM. The Motion Hearing currently set for Tuesday, 8/31/2021 is vacated. The Court takes the motions under submission on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cwlc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
11 11 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 08/16 6:59 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byAlberto De La Rosa, Blas Trujillo.(Macias, Jose)
Related: [-] 7 MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service - Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand to State Court
Monday, August 09, 2021
10 10 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 08/09 2:06 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byNorcal Nursery, LLC, Planasa US Holdings, LLC, Planasa, LLC, Planasa-California Reo, LLC.(Miller, James)
Related: [-] 7 MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to State Court
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
9 9 oth_sup Re-notice motion Tue 07/27 12:39 PM
Renotice motion hearing re7 MOTION to Remand filed byAlberto De La Rosa, Blas Trujillo. Related [+] (Macias, Jose)
Related: [-] 7
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/05 1:41 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS: Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2021 02:00 PM VIA ZOOM WEBINAR Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 07/27 8:04 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. The Motion to Remand at Dkt. no.7 was noticed for a hearing less than 35 days notice required. The 8/24/2021 Motion hearing date is VACATED. Counsel needs to re-notice (not re-file) the Motion for a Tuesday at 2:00pm for a Tuesday hearing date 8/31/21 or later. The briefing dates remain in place. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Remand Mon 07/26 9:52 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Alberto De La Rosa, Blas Trujillo. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/9/2021. Replies due by 8/16/2021.(Macias, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Jose Macias, Jr. ISO of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service Certification of Interested Entities or Persons,
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service
Thursday, July 01, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/01 10:40 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/1/21.(haS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 07/01 9:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 28, 2021
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Norcal Nursery, LLC, Planasa US Holdings, LLC, Planasa, LLC, Planasa-California Reo, LLC.. (Miller, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
3 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2021 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Stanislaus County Superior Court. Their case number is CV-20-002338. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16112671). Filed by Norcal Nursery, LLC, Planasa US Holdings, LLC, Planasa, LLC, Planasa-California Reo, LLC.(Miller, James) Modified on 6/25/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration Decl. of James D. Miller ISO Defendants' Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Declaration Decl. of Michael Delaney ISO Defendants' Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service Certification of Interested Entities or Persons,
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service for Defendants' Notice of Removal