Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Amanda M Knapp
Case #: 5:21-cv-01285
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2021
Terminated:Mar 02, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 29, 2021 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
Sam Falletta
4150 Belden Village St. NW, #205
Canton, OH 44718
Represented By
James M. Patrick
Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland
contact info
Jazmyn J. Stover
Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland
contact info
Richard A. Millisor
Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Incept Corporation
4150 Belden Village Street NW #205
Canton, OH 44718
Represented By
James M. Patrick
Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland
contact info
Jazmyn J. Stover
Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland
contact info
Richard A. Millisor
Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracey Scaggs
on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated 670 Hancock Ave. Apt. L.
Akron, OH 44314
Represented By
Alanna B. Klein Fischer
Lazzaro Law
contact info
Lori M. Griffin
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law Firm
contact info
Matthew S. Grimsley
Lazzaro Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 02, 2023
59 59 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/02 4:21 PM
Order of Dismissal and Approving Settlement. Case is dismissed with prejudice, each Party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs except and otherwise provided by the Agreement. All pending deadlines are stricken as moot. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the Parties' Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 3/2/2023. Related [+] (S,S)
Related: [-] lated document58
Monday, February 27, 2023
58 58 19 pgs motion Order Mon 02/27 4:15 PM
Joint Motion Approval of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Tracey Scaggs.(Fischer, Alanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release,
Att: 2 Appendix 1 to Exhibit 1 - Individual Payments,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - General Settlement and Release Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Alanna Klein Fischer,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Order
Friday, February 24, 2023
57 57 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 02/24 5:15 PM
Notice of Withdrawing Consent Form filed by Tracey Scaggs. (Fischer, Alanna)
Related: [-]