Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Arenda L Wright Allen
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:21-cv-00369
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2021
Terminated:Sep 30, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 29, 2021 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc.
Represented By
Alex Evan Wallin
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
William Charles Wagner
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp (in-Na)
contact info
Defendant
Central Radio Company, Inc.
Plaintiff
FCCI Insurance Company
Represented By
Diane U. Montgomery
Midkiff Muncie & Ross PC
contact info
Robert Tayloe Ross
Midkiff Muncie & Ross PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By
Diane U. Montgomery
Midkiff Muncie & Ross PC
contact info
Robert Tayloe Ross
Midkiff Muncie & Ross PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/29 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by FCCI Insurance Company, Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company (Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
notice Notice (other) Tue 09/28 10:31 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The court has been advised that the matters between the parties are settled. At the direction of the court, we must notify you that the matter will be dismissed agreed with prejudice unless an otherwise appropriate dismissal order is submitted by counsel within eleven (11) days from the date of this notice. This deadline may be extended only by an order of court obtained by counsel. If this matter requires court approval of the settlement, you should arrange an appropriate date for a hearing on settlement approval with the assigned judges calendar clerk. The court appreciates your giving this matter your prompt attention. (mrees, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Mon 09/27 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Settlement and Consent Motion to Stay All Case Deadlines by BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc.(Wallin, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
18 18 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 08/17 11:32 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, FCCI Insurance Company as to Central Radio Company, Inc.. (Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/17 11:28 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, FCCI Insurance Company. Central Radio Company, Inc. waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/11 10:43 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. BAE NSR shall have up to and including September 28, 2021, in which to move, respond, or otherwise plead in response to the Amended Complaint. Further requests for extensions will be viewed in disfavor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 8/11/21. (mrees, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/10 12:22 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re11 Amended Complaint, by BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc..(Wallin, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
14 14 order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Tue 08/03 4:55 PM
ORDER granting10 , a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William C. Wagner as certified by local counsel Alex E. Wallin for BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 08/03/2021. (Allen, Arenda)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
13 13 service Summons Issued Mon 08/02 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Central Radio Company, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(mrees, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedure
Friday, July 30, 2021
12 12 misc Proposed Summons Fri 07/30 5:18 PM
Proposed Summons re11 Amended Complaint, to Central Radio Company, Inc. by FCCI Insurance Company, Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. (Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/30 5:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc., Central Radio Company, Inc., filed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, FCCI Insurance Company.(Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certified CGL Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Umbrella Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Underlying Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Underlying Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - BAE Tender Letter
Thursday, July 29, 2021
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/29 9:59 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William C. Wagner and Certification of Local Counsel Alex E. Wallin Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7916775. by BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc.. (Wallin, Alex)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 07/29 9:51 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc.. (Wallin, Alex)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/29 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Evan Wallin on behalf of BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc. (Wallin, Alex)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 07/27 4:46 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, FCCI Insurance Company as to BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc.. (Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/27 4:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, FCCI Insurance Company. BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc. waiver sent on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 07/06 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
Friday, July 02, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/02 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Tayloe Ross on behalf of FCCI Insurance Company, Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company (Ross, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 07/02 3:40 PM
Proposed Summons to BAE Systems Norfolk Ship Repair, Inc. by FCCI Insurance Company, Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. (Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 07/02 3:29 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by FCCI Insurance Company, Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. (Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/02 3:09 PM
Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7873207.), filed by Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, FCCI Insurance Company.(Montgomery, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certified CGL Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Umbrella Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Underlying Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Underlying Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - BAE Tender Letter,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 07/06 2:55 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
Related: [-]