New Mexico District Court
Judge:William P Johnson
Referred: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Case #: 1:21-cv-00620
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1346 Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2021
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 29, 2021 1:43 AM MST
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Kimberly N Bell
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Joleen Youngers
Represented By
Daniel Yohalem
Daniel Yohalem Attorney At Law
contact info
Katherine E Murray
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
24 24 2 pgs ORDER CLOSING CASES by District Judge William P. Johnson. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
NOTICE: Effective February 3, 2025, all courtroom events previously scheduled in the Cimarron Courtroom in Albuquerque before District Judge William P. Johnson have been relocated to the Gila Courtroom (5th Floor). This change pertains to the courtroom location only; all dates and times remain the same. (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
22 22 NOTICE by United States of America Of Withdrawal Of Counsel (Bell, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
21 21 NOTICE by United States of America of Withdrawal Of Counsel (Bell, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
20 20 Order Scheduling Jury Trial and Pretrial Deadlines: Jury Selection/Trial set for 5/12/2025 at 09:00 AM and Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom before Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (fs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trial Prep Civil
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
18 18 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Brett C Eaton substituted for Elizabeth M. Martinez (Eaton, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
17 17 1 pgs ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
16 16 1 pgs ORDER Vacating Consolidation Order14 by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
14 14 1 pgs ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting13 Motion to Consolidate Related Cases. (cmm)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
13 13 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Joleen Youngers. (Yohalem, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
12 12 2 pgs ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting11 Motion to Continue JSR and granting11 Motion to Vacate Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference . Scheduling Conference on 10/20/2021 is VACATED. The parties shall file a motion to consolidate as stated in the attached order. (smd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
11 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Joint Status Report , Joint MOTION to Vacate Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference by Joleen Youngers. (Yohalem, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proposed Order
Monday, October 04, 2021
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
8 8 3 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/20/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Five minutes prior to the start of the Conference, the parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/29/2021. (smd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
7 7 ANSWER to1 Complaint by United States of America. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Joleen Youngers.(Bell, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Joleen Youngers voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Yohalem, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
5 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Letter dated January 8, 2021 [Re: USDHS Denial of Tort Claim], Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint by Certified Mail served on Merrick Garland on July 9, 2021, filed by Joleen Youngers. (Lax, Irene)
Related: [-]
4 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Letter dated January 8, 2021 [Re: USDHS Denial of Tort Claim], Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint served on Fred J. Federici on July 8, 2021, filed by Joleen Youngers. (Lax, Irene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
Summons Issued as to United States of America. (arp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
2 2 NOTICE by Joleen Youngers re1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Yohalem, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Joleen Youngers. (Yohalem, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7770537 re1 Complaint filed by Joleen Youngers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Yohalem, Daniel)
Related: [-]