New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:21-cv-03759
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2021
Terminated:Feb 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 29, 2021 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC
Represented By
Adam Granek Guttell
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Juliana Spano
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary Ware
Represented By
Andrew R Sack
The Law Offices Of Scott A. Lucas
contact info
Scott A. Lucas
Law Offices Of Scott A. Lucas
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/08 10:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
order Scheduling Order Mon 02/06 9:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the anticipated settlement of this matter, the scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, to be concluded by March 30, 2023. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by April 13, 2023. The March 23, 2023 final conference is adjourned to May 11, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, not later than May 9, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/6/2023. (BJ)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/06 9:24 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In light of the settlement in principle this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to its reinstatement should the settlement not be consummated. Barring any further requests for an extension within 90 days of this order, this dismissal shall deemed with prejudiceOrdered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/6/2023. (KM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
34 34 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 02/03 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (and request to adjourn all deadlines, sine die) by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 11/07 9:54 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, to be concluded by February 23, 2023. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by March 3, 2023. The February 23, 20232 final conference is adjourned to March 23, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, not later than March 20, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/7/2022. (BJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
33 33 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 11/04 8:51 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
32 32 22 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/02 3:51 PM
ANSWER to27 Amended Complaint,,,, by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
31 31 misc Letter Fri 10/28 9:15 AM
Letter Linked to DKT no. 28 by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 10/26 11:14 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended until November 2, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/26/2022. (BJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 10/25 3:05 PM
Proposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re27 Amended Complaint,,,, by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Bodansky, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/21 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Bodansky on behalf of Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC (aty to be noticed) (Bodansky, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
28 28 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 10/19 11:42 AM
ORDER re22 : See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/19/2022. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
order Order to Answer Mon 09/26 2:57 PM
ORDER: The26 Stipulation is approved. The time for by Gary Ware Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to October 25, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/26/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 24, 2022
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 09/24 10:13 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT under FRCP 15(a)(2) [see Stipulation at Dkt. 26] against Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC, filed by Gary Ware. (Lucas, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Wesnofskes Jan. 21, 2021 email to Ware,
Att: 2 Exhibit Wesnofske and CEOs Jan. 17, 2021 email exchange,
Att: 3 Exhibit Wesnofskes Jan. 31, 2021 email to CEO,
Att: 4 Exhibit CEOs Feb. 15, 2021 email to LaBarre and Willson,
Att: 5 Exhibit Wesnofskes notes prepared at some point in time,
Att: 6 Exhibit Wesnofskes Feb. 9, 2021 email to HR Director,
Att: 7 Exhibit CEOs Feb. 27, 2021 email to Wesnofske,
Att: 8 Exhibit Wares Feb. 16, 2021 email to Ticker,
Att: 9 Exhibit Wesnofskes Feb. 27, 2021 email to HR Director,
Att: 10 Exhibit Wesnofskes Feb. 28, 2021 email to CEO,
Att: 11 Exhibit Wesnofskes March 1, 2021 email to CEO,
Att: 12 Exhibit CEOs March 1, 2021 email to Wesnofske,
Att: 13 Exhibit Wesnofskes March 6, 2021 email to CEO,
Att: 14 Exhibit CEOs March 9, 2021 email to Wesnofske and HR Director,
Att: 15 Exhibit Wesnofskes March 24, 2021 email to CEO and HR Director,
Att: 16 Exhibit Wesnofske and CEOs March 24, 2021 email exchanges,
Att: 17 Exhibit Written Warning dated March 25, 2021,
Att: 18 Exhibit May 1-2, 2021 text message exchange between Ware and McGill
26 26 misc Stipulation Sat 09/24 9:56 AM
STIPULATION re filing of Amended Complaint by Gary Ware (Lucas, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/16 5:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION for Discovery filed by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 09/15 11:58 AM
ORDER denying23 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's deposition shall go forward remotely as originally noticed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/15/2022. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 09/14 7:39 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 Letter MOTION to Compel in-person deposition filed by Gary Ware. (Lucas, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Deposition Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ware Declaration
23 23 motion Compel Wed 09/14 10:54 AM
Letter MOTION to Compel in-person deposition by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Discovery Wed 09/14 10:41 AM
MOTION for Discovery by Gary Ware. (Lucas, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 101 pgs Exhibit Amended Complaint (proposed),
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant's Privilege Log,
Att: 3 Exhibit Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Emails
Friday, September 02, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/02 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Kang on behalf of Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kang, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Mon 08/01 9:29 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Scott A. Lucas (Lucas, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 07/07 9:56 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, to be concluded by January 12, 2023. Any party planning on making a dispositive motion must take the first step in the motion process by February 2, 2023. The October 27, 2022 final conference is adjourned to February 23, 2023 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, not later than February 21, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/7/2022. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 07/06 1:32 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 02/22 1:33 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew R Sack terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/22/2022. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
18 18 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 02/18 11:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion to Withdraw As Counsel filed by Gary Ware. (Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 02/18 11:31 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary Ware. (Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/18 11:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for October 27, 2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/17/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Scheduling Conference Settlement Conference Telephone Conference Thu 11/18 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Conference held on 11/17/2021. The parties proposed schedule was approved. A scheduling order will be issued under a separate order. Should the parties wish to pursue mediation a joint request may be submitted. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/17 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Juliana Spano on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Spano, Juliana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
order Order(Other) Tue 11/16 4:52 PM
ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar the time of the November 17, 2021 conference is adjourned to 3:30 p.m. The Court will initiate the conference call. The call in instructions are as follows: The parties are directed to dial (888) 684-8852 prior to the scheduled time to access the call center. At the prompt enter access code 7625765. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/16/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
order Scheduling Order Tue 10/26 5:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for November 17, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the conference call. The call in instructions are as follows: The parties are directed to dial (888) 684-8852 prior to the scheduled time to access the call center. At the prompt enter access code 7625765. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/26/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) Modified on 10/26/2021 (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 09/23 12:34 PM
ORDER re13 : The Protective Order is approved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/23/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
13 13 5 pgs motion Protective Order Tue 09/21 3:11 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 09/09 9:24 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/09 4:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by September 10, 2021. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/9/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) Form
Friday, July 30, 2021
10 10 27 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/30 10:34 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Disclosure of Interested Parties Fri 07/30 10:31 AM
DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/30 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Granek Guttell on behalf of Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC (aty to be noticed) (Guttell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
7 7 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/12 1:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Ware. Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/07 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R Sack on behalf of Gary Ware (aty to be noticed) (Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 07/07 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 07/07 3:38 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 07/07 3:25 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/07 3:30 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/02 5:44 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Gary Ware (Lucas, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/02 5:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Eastern Wholesale Fence LLC a/k/a Eastern Wholesale Fence NY LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14624658 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Gary Ware. (Lucas, Scott)
Related: [-]