Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:21-cv-11106
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2021
Terminated:Jun 07, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 02, 2022 4:35 AM EST
Defendant
General Motors Financial Company, Inc.
Represented By
Michael T. Grant
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
TransUnion, LLC
Represented By
Mardic A. Marashian
Bonin & Marashian
contact info
Cayla M. Irlbeck
Schuckit & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Duane Burdick
Represented By
Yitzchak Zelman
Marcus & Zelman, LLC
contact info
Kevin V.K. Crick
Rights Protection Law Group, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 08/05/2021


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/07 8:31 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff and Trans Union, LLC Only by TransUnion, LLC.(Marashian, Mardic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal
notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Tue 06/07 9:54 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Status Conference previously set for 6/29/22 is CANCELLED. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
notice Notice Resetting Hearings Wed 06/01 2:39 PM
NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Status Conference reset for 6/29/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (In person only) before District Judge Angel Kelley. Should the parties wish to appear by video conference, and all parties assent to such change, they may reach out to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to modify the hearing no later than two business days prior to the scheduled hearing. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Fri 01/07 11:34 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/21/2022 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (In person only) before District Judge Angel Kelley. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/09 11:49 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to General Motors Financial Company, Inc. by Duane Burdick.(Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Dismissal Order
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 10/26 1:40 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re22 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The Court adopts the parties' proposed pretrial schedule. Any amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties due by January 21, 2022. Fact discovery to be completed by June 20, 2022. Dispositive motions due by August 22, 2022. The scheduling conference previously set for 10/27/21 at 3:00PM is cancelled. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
22 22 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Wed 10/20 3:18 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
notice Notice of Reassignment Tue 10/19 3:27 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Angel Kelley added. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Tue 09/21 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 10/27/2021 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/17 11:24 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Motors Financial Company, Inc.. (Grant, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/17 11:11 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by General Motors Financial Company, Inc..(Grant, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
17 17 misc Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff Thu 08/05 4:21 PM
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Electronic clerks notice filed on 8/5 filed in error. Entry deleted from record. (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/05 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Duane Burdick (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/29 1:14 PM
Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC.(Irlbeck, Cayla)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/26 10:54 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2021 to answer1 Complaint, General Motors Financial Company, Inc. answer due 8/30/2021. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
13 13 motion Extension of Time Fri 07/23 3:33 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2021 to Respond to Complaint by General Motors Financial Company, Inc..(Grant, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 07/23 9:15 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Cayla M. Irlbeck. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/23 8:56 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TransUnion, LLC. (Marashian, Mardic)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/23 8:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Cayla M. Irlbeck Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8871046 by TransUnion, LLC.(Marashian, Mardic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, July 22, 2021
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/22 10:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed TransUnion, LLC served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/19 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Grant on behalf of General Motors Financial Company, Inc. (Grant, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/16 3:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/13 12:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed General Motors Financial Company, Inc. served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Thu 07/08 3:54 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Yitzchak Zelman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 07/08 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8850227 by Duane Burdick.(Crick, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 07/06 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 07/06 11:17 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/06 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT against General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8845877 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Duane Burdick.(Crick, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form