Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:21-cv-03892
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2021
Terminated:Sep 30, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 02, 2022 4:11 AM EST
Defendant
Universal Windows Direct, LLC
950 Main Ave., Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Christine M. Snyder
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Thomas R Simmons
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Drew Dragon
513 Stockbridge Rd.
Columbus, OH 43207
Represented By
Carrie J. Dyer
Mansell Law LLC
contact info
Gregory R Mansell
Mansell Law LLC
contact info
Kyle Anderson
Luper, Neidenthal & Logan
contact info

GPO May 18 2022
ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion to Stay Case Pending Mediation. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/18/2022. (cmw)
GPO Jun 20 2022
ORDER granting 20 SECOND ORDER GRANTING STAY PENDING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/20/2022. (cmw)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 30, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/30 10:28 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (tla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/29 10:25 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Drew Dragon. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 09/09 11:11 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting25 Request for Extension of Time. Dismissal Entry or Status Report due by 9/30/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/9/2022. (agm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
25 25 misc Status Report Wed 09/07 6:35 PM
STATUS REPORT of the Parties by Plaintiff Drew Dragon. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/30 4:41 PM
ORDER: The Mediator reported that this case had settled and that a dismissal entry would be filed by September 8, 2022 (ECF No.23 ). Accordingly, the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint written report detailing the status of this case by September 8, 2022, unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 08/30/2022. (tla)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 08/29 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Settlement 2:21-cv-03892 by Mediator Jeffrey W Hutson (Hutson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/12 10:29 AM
ORDER - Currently, a private mediation is scheduled to be held in this case on August 19, 2022. The parties intend to use various rooms provided by the Court to conduct the session. Due to a scheduling conflict, the parties, at the Courts direction, have rescheduled their mediation to occur on August 25, 2022, at 10:00 A.M. The stay previously granted in this case (ECF No.21 ) shall continue through that date. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/12/2022. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 06/20 6:32 PM
ORDER granting20 SECOND ORDER GRANTING STAY PENDING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/20/2022. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
20 20 motion Stay Thu 06/16 3:21 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay (Continued) Pending Mediation Outcome by Plaintiff Drew Dragon. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 05/18 12:05 PM
ORDER granting18 Joint Motion to Stay Case Pending Mediation. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/18/2022. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
18 18 motion Stay Tue 05/17 9:22 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Mediation by Plaintiff Drew Dragon. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
med Notice Designating Mediator Mon 05/02 11:30 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Jeffrey W Hutson assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in June 2022, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
17 17 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Tue 04/19 10:03 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in June 2022 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 4/29/2022 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/15 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Lyn Hill for Plaintiff Drew Dragon (Hill, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/14 10:49 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Drew Dragon of Filing Consent Forms (Fourth) (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Consent to Join Lawsuit
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/08 12:39 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Drew Dragon of Filing Consent Forms (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Consents
Monday, January 31, 2022
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/31 9:26 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Drew Dragon of Filing Consent Forms (Second) (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Consent to Join Lawsuit
Monday, January 24, 2022
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/24 11:05 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Drew Dragon of Filing Consent Forms (First) (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Consents to Join Lawsuit
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/21 12:38 PM
ORDER Granting ECF No.9 Joint Stipulation of Conditional Class Certification and Notice to Class Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/21/2021. (cmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/17 12:38 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Drew Dragon of Withdrawal of Co-Counsel (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 10/06 2:08 PM
STIPULATION OF CONDITIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE TO CLASS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. §216 (b) by Plaintiff Drew Dragon. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Notice & Consent Form,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Exh. B - Proposed Order
Monday, September 27, 2021
8 8 4 pgs order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Mon 09/27 9:53 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The October 4, 2021 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Class Certification Motion due by 6/3/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2021. Motions to Amend due by 12/31/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 10/29/2021. Discovery due by 5/18/2022. Dispositive motions due by 6/3/2022. Primary Expert due by 3/31/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 5/13/2022. Settlement Demand due by 1/28/2022. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/18/2022. Motions due by 10/4/2021. Mediation Deadline: 6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/27/2021. (daf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 09/23 1:46 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Drew Dragon. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/08 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2021 01:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/07 4:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Universal Windows Direct, LLC. (Simmons, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/09 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Simmons for Defendant Universal Windows Direct, LLC (Simmons, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/09 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christine M. Snyder for Defendant Universal Windows Direct, LLC (Snyder, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/03 6:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Universal Windows Direct, LLC on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Mansell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/06 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Universal Windows Direct, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8389822), filed by Drew Dragon. (Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Consent to Join Lawsuit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Exh. B - Civil Cover Sheet