California Eastern District Court
Judge:Morrison C England, Jr
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:21-cv-01190
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2021
Terminated:Feb 01, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 02, 2022 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
City of Tracy
Defendant
Yordan Coss
Defendant
Fabiola Hernandez
Plaintiff
Lloyd Thomas Bernhard, II
Represented By
David John Beauvais
Law Office Of David J. Beauvais
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Celeste Tejada-Otero
Represented By
David John Beauvais
Law Office Of David J. Beauvais
contact info

GPO Feb 01 2023
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/01/23 DISMISSING this action with prejudice for failure to comply with the applicable rules and orders of this Court. CASE CLOSED(Licea Chavez, V)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
7 7 order Judgment Wed 02/01 11:38 AM
JUDGMENT dated *2/1/23* pursuant to order signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/01/23. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/01 11:37 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/01/23 DISMISSING this action with prejudice for failure to comply with the applicable rules and orders of this Court. CASE CLOSED(Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 12/29 11:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court's review of this action reveals no indication the defendants have been served with the Complaint, as required by the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) authorizes the court to dismiss an action where service has not been effectuated within those time parameters. Plaintiffs are thus ordered to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or to comply with the applicable rules. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to file a response, in writing, not later than 1/13/2023. Failure to file a response will result in dismissal of this action, with prejudice and without further notice. (Deutsch, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for MCE Wed 07/07 10:19 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Wed 07/07 10:17 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Tracy, Yordan Coss, Fabiola Hernandez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David J. Beauvais* *Attorney at Law* *1300 Clay Street, Suite 600* *Oakland, California 94612*. Related [+]
Related: [-] ader, L
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lloyd Thomas Bernhard, II, Stephanie Celeste Tejada-Otero (Beauvais, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Stephanie Celeste Tejada-Otero. Attorney Beauvais, David John added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9690396) (Beauvais, David)
Related: [-]