Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:18-bk-83256

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:21-ap-80078
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2021
Terminated:Nov 02, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
BBVA / Compass Bancshares, Inc.
15 South 20th Street
Birmingham, AL 35296
Defendant
MRS BPO, LLC
1930 Olney Ave
Cherry Hill, NJ 08003
Plaintiff
David Schulte
907 Logwood Rd
Hartselle, AL 35640
Represented By
Melissa W. Larsen
Melissa Wimberley Law, PC
contact info
Trustee
Michele T. Hatcher
Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Box 2388
Decatur, AL 35602


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/02 12:32 PM
Adversary Case 8:21-ap-80078 Closed (bng)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 08/19 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Application for Compensation
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 08/19 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
17 17 order Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Tue 08/17 2:23 PM
Order Approving Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Related [+] Signed on 8/17/2021. (bng)
Related: [-] #12
16 16 order Compensation Tue 08/17 2:22 PM
Order Approving Application For Compensation Related [+] for Melissa W. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Fees awarded: $1500.00, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 8/17/2021 Signed on 8/17/2021. (bng)
Related: [-] #7
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
14 14 trustee Bankruptcy Administrator Statement of Review Regarding Application for Comp & Reimburse Tue 08/10 10:36 AM
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Recommending Approval Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe Related [+]. (Blythe, Richard)
Related: [-] 7 Application for Compensation for Melissa W. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 6/1/2021 to 7/22/2021, Fee: $1500, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney Melissa W. Larsen filed by Plaintiff David Schulte
Friday, August 06, 2021
13 13 court Hearing Scheduled Fri 08/06 12:01 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 8/16/2021 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (tcw)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Defendant BBVA / Compass Bancshares, Inc.
Thursday, August 05, 2021
12 12 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Thu 08/05 2:25 PM
Amended Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation Filed Jointly Related [+] Filed by Defendant BBVA / Compass Bancshares, Inc. (Hoffmann, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 misc Corrective Entry Thu 08/05 2:22 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Full PDF Not Attached Filed by Defendant BBVA / Compass Bancshares, Inc. Related [+]. (Hoffmann, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 10 Amended Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation Filed Jointly
10 10 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Thu 08/05 1:55 PM
**ENTERED IN ERROR** Amended Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation Filed Jointly Filed by Defendant BBVA / Compass Bancshares, Inc. (Hoffmann, Jonathan) Modified on 8/6/2021 (tcw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 07/28 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 07/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Telephonic Hearing
Monday, July 26, 2021
8 8 court Notice of Telephonic Hearing Mon 07/26 9:31 AM
Notice of Telephonic Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 8/16/2021 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (bng)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Defendant BBVA / Compass Bancshares, Inc., Plaintiff David Schulte,7 Application for Compensation filed by Plaintiff David Schulte
Friday, July 23, 2021
7 7 motion Compensation Fri 07/23 9:32 AM
Application for Compensation for Melissa W. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 6/1/2021 to 7/22/2021, Fee: $1500, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney Melissa W. Larsen (Larsen, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
6 6 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Thu 07/22 4:05 PM
Joint Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation Filed by Defendant BBVA / Compass Bancshares, Inc., Plaintiff David Schulte (Hoffmann, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/08 12:20 PM
Certificate of Service BBVA Filed by Plaintiff David Schulte. (Larsen, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt - Claim Signatory
Att: 2 Certified Mail Receipt - BBVA
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/08 12:14 PM
Certificate of Service MRS BPA, LLC Filed by Plaintiff David Schulte. (Larsen, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipt
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Tue 07/06 3:58 PM
Summons Issued (dwh)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 07/06 3:54 PM
Summons Issued (dwh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/06 1:11 PM
Adversary case 21-80078 14 Related [+]) Complaint by David Schulte against BBVA / Compass Bancshares, Inc., MRS BPO, LLC. Receipt Number 0, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, Melissa)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other