Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: Lakeysha Greer Isaac
Case #: 3:21-cv-00445
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2021
Terminated:Oct 25, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jan 02, 2022 3:09 AM CST
Defendant
Manny Malekan
Defendant
Yazooville Commons, LLC
Plaintiff
TIAA, FSB
Represented By
John M. Lassiter
Burr & Forman, Llp - Jackson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 25, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/25 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TIAA, FSB (Lassiter, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
4 4 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 08/12 5:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re3 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Immediate Access to Collateral filed by TIAA, FSB (Lassiter, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appoint Receiver Thu 08/12 5:42 PM
MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Immediate Access to Collateral by TIAA, FSB(Lassiter, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Kienzler Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Henderson Affidavit
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 08/10 10:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Manny Malekan, Yazooville Commons, LLC. (MGB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/07 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Manny Malekan, Yazooville Commons, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 4599681), filed by TIAA, FSB.(MGB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Assignment,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Guaranty,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Notice of Default,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Notice of Acceleration,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Notice of Additional Defaults,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet