Friel v. Dapper Labs, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Victor Marrero |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-05837 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 03, 2022 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant
Dapper Labs, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Roham Gharegozlou
|
|
Lead Plaintiff
Gary Leuis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeeun Friel
|
|
Plaintiff
John Austin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
63 | 63
3
pgs
order
Case Management Plan
Tue 04/02 4:20 PM
SECOND AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Scheduling Order and Case Management Plan is adopted in accordance with Fed.R. Civ. P. 16-26(f). It supersedes the previous Order entered at Dkt. No. 51.This case is to be tried to a jury. No additional parties to be joined without leave of the Court. No further amended pleadings may be filed without leave of the Court. Depositions to be completed by June 17, 2024. Plaintiffs: Motion for class certification due May 2, 2024. Defendant's opposition due July 16, 2024. Plaintiffs' reply due August 15, 2024. Following all discovery, all counsel must meet for at least one hour to discuss settlement,such conference to be held by not later than August 30, 2024.The Joint Pretrial Order should be prepared in accordance with Judge Marrero's Individual Practices. If this action is to be tried before a jury, proposed voir dire and Jury instructions shall be filed with the Joint Pretrial Order. No motion for summary Judgment shall be served after the deadline fixed for the Joint Pretrial Order. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Motions due by 11/19/2024. Responses due by 12/23/2024 Replies due by 1/23/2025. Deposition due by 10/21/2024. Fact Discovery due by 6/17/2024. Expert Discovery due by 10/21/2024. Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Victor Marrero. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/2/2024) (jca) |
|
62 | 62
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 04/02 4:14 PM
ORDER granting61 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/2/2024) (jca) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
61 | 61
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 04/01 2:05 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Phillip Kim and Kenneth P. Herzinger dated 4/1/2024. Document filed by Gary Leuis..(Cohen, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order |