California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 4:21-cv-05242
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2021
Terminated:Nov 22, 2021
Case in other court:Contra Costa County Superior Court, C21-01183
Last checked: Monday Jan 03, 2022 1:43 AM PST
Defendant
Bank of America
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage
Represented By
Katalina Baumann
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Justin Donald Balser
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Ariel Stern
Akerman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Katalina Baumann
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Justin Donald Balser
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Ariel Stern
Akerman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie Lynne Montgomery
764 Rock Rose Way
Richmond, CA 94806
Plaintiff
Ray Montgomery
764 Rock Rose Way
Richmond, CA 94806


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 15, 2021
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Thu 07/15 11:15 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (amgS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
9 9 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Wed 07/14 2:46 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byNationstar Mortgage, U.S. Bank, N.A.. Related [+] (Baumann, Katalina)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 motion Dismiss Wed 07/14 2:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage, U.S. Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 7/28/2021. Replies due by 8/4/2021.(Baumann, Katalina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 12, 2021
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 07/12 4:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nationstar Mortgage, U.S. Bank, N.A... (Baumann, Katalina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 07/08 12:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nationstar Mortgage, U.S. Bank, N.A. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Baumann, Katalina)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 07/08 11:42 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Nationstar Mortgage, U.S. Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, N.A.; Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. (formerly known as WMIH Corp.) for Nationstar Mortgage. (Baumann, Katalina)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 07/08 9:37 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom - to be determined. (slhS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 07/08 9:42 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] re:2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Nationstar Mortgage, U.S. Bank, N.A.. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. (slhS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 07/07 3:17 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/21/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 07/07 3:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Nationstar Mortgage, DBA Mr. Cooper, U.S. Bank, N.A., As Trustee For MLM1 Trust Series 2006-HE4 (Baumann, Katalina)
Related: [-]
1 1 49 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Wed 07/07 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C21-01183. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16152521). Filed byU.S. Bank, N.A., As Trustee For MLM1 Trust Series 2006-HE4, Nationstar Mortgage, DBA Mr. Cooper.(Baumann, Katalina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet