California Southern District Court
Judge:Linda Lopez
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:21-cv-01224
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983cv Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2021
Terminated:Dec 03, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 03, 2022 1:37 AM PST
Defendant
Lisa Deines
Defendant
Jennifer Rose
Defendant
Layanie L. Johnson
Represented By
Talia Edelman
contact info
Erica R. Cortez
contact info
Defendant
Priscilla Villafana
Represented By
Talia Edelman
contact info
Erica R. Cortez
contact info
Plaintiff
John Joseph Whittington Jr
Plaintiff
John-Joseph Whittigton Jr
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Gary Michael Bubis
Terminated: 12/03/2021
Represented By
Carmela E. Duke
Superior Court Of California, County Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Caitlin Martin Jones Zaback
Terminated: 12/03/2021
Represented By
Nima Shull
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Defendant
Browder Alphonso Willis III
Terminated: 12/03/2021
Represented By
Carmela E. Duke
Superior Court Of California, County Of San Diego
contact info

GPO Dec 03 2021
ORDER (1) Granting Motions To Dismiss Filed By Defendants Willis, Bubis, And Zaback, And (2) Denying As Moot Motion To Dismiss Filed Be Defendants Villafana And Johnson. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/3/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxf)
GPO Apr 05 2022
ORDER Denying Petition For Reconsideration [ECF No.34]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 4/5/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ddf)

Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
38 38 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 04/05 1:27 PM
ORDER Denying Petition For Reconsideration [ECF No.34 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 4/5/2022. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ddf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
37 37 2 pgs order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 01/10 2:35 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw to the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez. All dates currently set before Judge Sabraw remain as scheduled before Judge Lopez. Dates before the Magistrate Judge are unaffected by this Order. The new case number is 21cv1224 LL (JLB). Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 01/07/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jcj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
36 36 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Thu 01/06 11:41 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw Rejecting Document: Motion for Entry of Default, from Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: FRCvP41 Case Closed per dkt 33, Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/6/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rejected Document
35 35 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Thu 01/06 11:36 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Petition for Reconsideration; Second Amended Complaint., from Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Non- compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: FRCvP 15 (d) - Supplemental documents require court order; LR 5 (1) (m) All documents filed must be filed separately; multiple pleadings in one filing not proper; FRCvP 41 Case closed/dismissed. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/16/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/6/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Reconsideration Thu 01/06 11:32 AM
Petition for Reconsideration; Second Amended Complaint by John Joseph Whittington Jr. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/16/2021. (zda) (Main Document 34 replaced on 1/6/2022) (zda). Modified on 1/6/2022 to replace image; NEF regenrated (zda)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
33 33 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 12/07 8:27 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court grants the motions to dismiss filed by Judges Willis and Bubis, and the motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Zaback, and dismisses Plaintiffs case with prejudice. Case is Closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
32 32 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 12/03 4:22 PM
ORDER (1) Granting Motions To Dismiss Filed By Defendants Willis, Bubis, And Zaback, And (2) Denying As Moot Motion To Dismiss Filed Be Defendants Villafana And Johnson. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/3/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
31 31 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Mon 11/29 3:48 PM
Order Re: Oral Argument. The December 3, 2021 motion hearing is vacated. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/29/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
30 30 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 11/23 2:40 PM
RESPONSE in Support re24 MOTION to Strike21 Notice (Other) filed by Layanie L. Johnson, Priscilla Villafana.(Edelman, Talia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, November 19, 2021
29 29 misc Affidavit Fri 11/19 2:49 PM
Affidavit of Truth and Facts by John Joseph Whittington in support of default judgement by Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/5/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda) (Main Document 29 replaced on 11/19/2021) (zda). Modified on 11/19/2021; NEF regenerated (zda)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Fri 11/19 2:36 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Affidavit of Truth and Facts by John Joseph Whittington in support of default judgement, from Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L Rule LR 5.1 Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/5/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/19/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/19 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Joseph Whittington Jr. Lisa Deines, Jennifer Rose served. Nunc Pro Tunc 8/6/2021. (Main Document 27 replaced on 11/19/2021) (zda). Modified on 11/19/2021 to update docket text; NEF regenerated (zda)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Fri 11/19 1:50 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Summons Returned Executed, from Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: OTHER: The document is not complete; not clear which defendant was served. Nunc Pro Tunc 8/6/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/19/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/17 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Individual Attorney and of Reassignment of Case to New Lead Attorney Within the Office of County Counsel by Layanie L. Johnson, Priscilla Villafana(Edelman, Talia)Attorney Talia Edelman added to party Layanie L. Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Talia Edelman added to party Priscilla Villafana(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, October 01, 2021
24 24 motion Strike Fri 10/01 5:49 PM
MOTION to Strike21 Notice (Other) by Layanie L. Johnson, Priscilla Villafana.(Cortez, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/01 5:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Quash for Improper Service Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(5) filed by Layanie L. Johnson, Priscilla Villafana.(Cortez, Erica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, September 27, 2021
22 22 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Mon 09/27 1:35 PM
Order Re: Oral Argument. The October 1, 2021 motion hearing is vacated. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/27/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/24 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Intent to Lodge Documents by John Joseph Whittington Jr. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/17/2021. (zda)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Fri 09/24 2:43 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Notice of Intent to Lodge Documents, from Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/17/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/24/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda) (Main Document 20 replaced on 9/24/2021) (zda)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Affidavit Fri 09/24 2:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Truth (To be Treated as a Claim Sworn in Writing) by Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/17/2021. (zda)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Fri 09/24 2:39 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Affidavit of Truth (To be Treated as a Claim Sworn in Writing), from Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Non- compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper format. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/17/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/24/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Declaration Fri 09/24 2:32 PM
Declaration of John of the Whittington Family by Plaintiff John-Joseph Whittigton Jr. Nunc Pro Tunc 9/17/2021. Modified on 9/24/2021 to update docket text (zda)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Fri 09/24 2:29 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting Document: Declaration of John of the Whittington Family, from Plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper format; Nunc Pro Tunc 9/17/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/24/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Reply - Other Fri 09/24 12:31 PM
REPLY - Other re11 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice filed by Gary Michael Bubis, Browder Alphonso Willis III.(Duke, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, August 27, 2021
14 14 motion Dismiss Fri 08/27 2:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Quash for Improper Service Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(5) by Layanie L. Johnson, Priscilla Villafana.(Cortez, Erica)Attorney Erica R. Cortez added to party Layanie L. Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Erica R. Cortez added to party Priscilla Villafana(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Erica Cortez,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
13 13 motion Dismiss Tue 08/17 4:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint And/Or To Seek More Definite Statement [F.R.C.P. Rules 8, 12(B)(1), 12(B)(4), 12(B)(5), 12(B)(6), And 12(E)] by Caitlin Martin Jones Zaback.(Shull, Nima)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/17 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nima Shull on behalf of Caitlin Martin Jones Zaback(Shull, Nima)Attorney Nima Shull added to party Caitlin Martin Jones Zaback(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
11 11 motion Dismiss Tue 08/17 2:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice by Gary Michael Bubis, Browder Alphonso Willis III.(Duke, Carmela)Attorney Carmela E. Duke added to party Gary Michael Bubis(pty:dft), Attorney Carmela E. Duke added to party Browder Alphonso Willis III(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Prejudice by Judicial Defendants Judge Gary M. Bubis and Judge Browder A. Willis III,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Friday, August 06, 2021
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/10 10:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Joseph Whittington Jr. Layanie L. Johnson served. (zda)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/10 10:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Joseph Whittington Jr. Browder Alphonso Willis III served. (zda)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/09 3:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Joseph Whittington Jr. Priscilla Villafana served. (zda)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/09 3:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Joseph Whittington Jr. Gary Michael Bubis served. (zda)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/09 2:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Joseph Whittington Jr. Caitlin Martin Jones Zaback served. (zda)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/09 2:53 PM
Certificate of Service by John Joseph Whittington. (zda)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 07/23 2:57 PM
Summons Issued RE: Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Mailed to plaintiff John Joseph Whittington Jr) (zda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/23 2:25 PM
First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand against Gary Michael Bubis, Lisa Deines, Layanie L. Johnson, Caitlin Martin Jones Zaback, Jennifer Rose, Priscilla Villafana, Browder Alphonso Willis III, filed by John Joseph Whittington Jr. New Summons Requested. (zda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/07 3:35 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (ekb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/07 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lisa Deines, Jennifer Rose ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS130878.), filed by John Joseph Whittington, Jr. The new case number is 3:21-cv-1224-DMS-JLB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Whittington Jr., John-Joseph)(ekb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet