Texas Western District Court
Judge:Philip R Martinez
Case #: 3:14-cv-00277
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2014
Terminated:Jul 30, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Jan 18, 2015 11:33 PM CST
Counter Defendant
Alliance Riggers & Constructors, LTD.
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Phillip Pruett
Counter Defendant
Paul Cordova
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Terry Stevens
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Melody Pruett
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Nick Lugo
Counter Defendant
El Paso Crane & Rigging, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Cordova Alliance, Inc.
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Roberta Cordova
Counter Defendant
Phillip Cordova
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Paul B. Cordova
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Frank H. Cordova
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Carlos E. Restrepo
doing business as Collectively RDI Global Services and R&D International PO Box 12066
El Paso, TX 79912
Counter Plaintiff
Linda S. Restrepo
doing business as Collectively RDI Global Services and R&D International PO Box 12066
El Paso, TX 79912
Defendant
Carlos E. Restrepo
doing business as Collectively RDI Global Services and R & D International PO Box 12066
El Paso, TX 79912
Defendant
Linda S. Restrepo
doing business as Collectively RDI Global Services and R&D International PO Box 12066
El Paso, TX 79912
Plaintiff
Alliance Riggers & Constructors, LTD.
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Riggers $ Constructors, LTD.
Represented By
Robert Wayne Pritchard
R. Wayne Pritchard, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
8 8 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Tue 10/06 2:26 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mg2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 31, 2014
7 7 Case Remanded from TXWD has been received and opened in County Court at Law Number Five (5) District, El Paso County, TX., Division as to case number 2012-DCV04523. (mg2) .
Related: [-]
6 6 Certified Mail Receipt of5 Order to Carlos E. Restrepo & Linda S. Restrepo (mg2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 30, 2014
5 5 CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND TO County Court at Law Number 5 AND GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED without PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $0 receipt number XXXXX), filed by Alliance Riggers & Constructors, LTD.(mg2)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER GRANTING1 Motion to Remand to State Court; GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 23, 2014
1 1 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alliance Riggers $ Constructors, LTD..(Pritchard, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit "A",
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit "B",
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit "C",
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand
Monday, July 21, 2014
2 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos E. Restrepo, Linda S. Restrepo.(jg1) (jg1). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/24/2014) (jg1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Motion Requesting for E-filing
Att: 4 (7/24/2014) Supplemental Cover Sheet
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (jg1)
Related: [-]