Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20305

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michele J Kim
Case #: 2:21-ap-02002
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2021
Terminated:Nov 08, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Capflow Inc. a/k/a Cap Flow Funding Group Managers LLC
201 State R. 17 Suite 805
Rutherford, NJ 07070
Defendant
Steven Zakharyayev
10 W 37th St. Rm 602
New York, NY 10018
Plaintiff
Delinah Sheree Homans
17 Villager Court
Saint Simons Island, GA 31522
Represented By
Jeremiah B Gastin
Gastin & Hill
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, November 08, 2021
31 31 court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/08 4:11 PM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-2002 Closed (RAF)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/08 12:59 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Judson C. Hill on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans. (Hill, Judson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
29 29 court Returned Mail Wed 10/20 8:47 AM
Returned Mail for Capflow Inc. a/k/a Cap Flow Funding Group Managers . See attached returned mail notice. The Pro Se Mail Recipient or Attorney for the Mail Recipient should supply the Court with a correct address. Related [+] (RAF)
Related: [-] 27
Saturday, October 16, 2021
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/17 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27
Thursday, October 14, 2021
27 27 court Hearing (AP - all types) Thu 10/14 12:40 PM
Notice of Continued Hearing to Show Cause Why Adversary Proceeding should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute Related [+]. Hearing originally scheduled on 10/14/2021. (RAF)
Related: [-] 7 ,20 ,23
26 26 notice Continued/Reassigned Hearing Thu 10/14 12:26 PM
PDF error. See Doc. #26. Notice of Continued Hearing to Show Cause Why Adversary Proceeding should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Hearing to be held on 11/10/2021 at 10:30 AM (BY TELEPHONE) for20 and for23 and for7 , Hearing originally scheduled on 10/14/2021. (RAF) Modified on 10/14/2021 (RAF)
Related: [-]
25 25 court Hearing Held Thu 10/14 12:22 PM
Show Cause Hearing Held on 10/14/2021 - DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS. Related [+] (RAF)
Related: [-] 7 ,20 ,23
Friday, October 01, 2021
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/02 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/01/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
23 23 court Hearing (AP - all types) Wed 09/29 9:09 AM
Notice of Hearing to Show Cause Why Adversary Proceeding should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 10/14/2021 at 10:30 AM at (BY TELEPHONE). (RAF)
Related: [-] 1 ,7 ,20
Monday, September 27, 2021
22 22 court Returned Mail Mon 09/27 4:45 PM
Returned Mail for Cap Flow Funding Group Managers, LLC . See attached returned mail notice. The Pro Se Mail Recipient or Attorney for the Mail Recipient should supply the Court with a correct address. Related [+] (RAF)
Related: [-] 20
Saturday, August 21, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 08/22 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Thursday, August 19, 2021
20 20 order Extend Time (order) Thu 08/19 1:23 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+]. Filed on 8/19/2021. Deadline due on 9/10/2021, plus an additional three days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (RAF)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, August 16, 2021
19 19 motion Extend Time Mon 08/16 1:07 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Judson C. Hill on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans. Related [+] (Hill, Judson)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 19, 2021
18 18 misc Certificate of Service/Amended Certificate of Service Mon 07/19 4:40 PM
Fourth Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Jeremiah B Gastin on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans Related [+] (Gastin, Jeremiah) Modified to correct docket text on 7/19/2021 (RAF)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 misc Certificate of Service/Amended Certificate of Service Mon 07/19 2:13 PM
Third Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Jeremiah B Gastin on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans Related [+] (Gastin, Jeremiah) Modified to correct docket text on 7/19/2021 (RAF)
Related: [-] 15 ,16
16 16 notice Defective Pleading Mon 07/19 12:43 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 7/26/2021. (RAF)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 misc Certificate of Service/Amended Certificate of Service Mon 07/19 10:22 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Jeremiah B Gastin on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans Related [+] (Gastin, Jeremiah)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
Sunday, July 18, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/19 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Saturday, July 17, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/18 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/17/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/18 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/17/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/18 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/17/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/18 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/17/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, July 16, 2021
9 9 notice Defective Pleading Fri 07/16 4:42 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 7/23/2021. (RAF)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Certificate of Service/Amended Certificate of Service Fri 07/16 11:11 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Jeremiah B Gastin on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans Related [+] (Gastin, Jeremiah)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, July 15, 2021
7 7 court Summons Issued/Reissued Thu 07/15 10:30 AM
Summons and Notice Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (RAF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Thu 07/15 9:00 AM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Jeremiah B Gastin on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans Related [+] (Gastin, Jeremiah)
Related: [-] 1 ,2 ,3 ,5
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/15 8:58 AM
Amended Complaint by Jeremiah B Gastin on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans against Delinah Sheree Homans. Related [+]. (Gastin, Jeremiah)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Saturday, July 10, 2021
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/11 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, July 08, 2021
3 3 notice Defective Pleading Thu 07/08 3:37 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 7/15/2021. (RAF)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Thu 07/08 9:49 AM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Jeremiah B Gastin on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans Related [+] (Gastin, Jeremiah)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/08 9:42 AM
Adversary case 21-02002 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Jeremiah B Gastin on behalf of Delinah Sheree Homans against Capflow Inc., Steven Zakharyayev. Fee Amount $0 (Gastin, Jeremiah)
Related: [-]