Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00173
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2021
Terminated:Apr 07, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jul 15, 2021 4:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Maria Benavides-Fuentes (1)
Represented By
Nick Davis
Law Office Of Nick G Davis PLLC
contact info
Jeffery Charles King
Law Office Of Jeffery King PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Sammy Mike Cisneros (3)
Represented By
David Miles Brissette
The Law Offices Of Gill & Brissette
contact info
Defendant
Jericho Ray Martinez (2)
Represented By
Sean Dewayne Colston
Colston Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alma Benavides-Fuentes (4)
Represented By
James Luster
Cofer Luster Law Firm PC
contact info
Timothy Michael Clancy
Law Office Of Tim Clancy
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Montes-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/12/2022 12:49 AM CST
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
Arrest of Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes, Alma Benavides-Fuentes (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
Arrest of Jericho Ray Martinez, Antonio Robles, Sammy Mike Cisneros (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
2 2 REDACTED COMPLAINT as to Jericho Ray Martinez, Antonio Robles, Sammy Mike Cisneros. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Nick Davis for Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Sean Dewayne Colston for Jericho Ray Martinez appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney David Miles Brissette for Sammy Mike Cisneros appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes, Alma Benavides-Fuentes held on 4/28/2021. Date of Arrest: 4/27/2021; Defts executed financial affidavits; o/appointing counsel entered; Rule 5(f) admonishment given; Preliminary & Detention Hearing set 5/3/21 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; o/temp detention entered; defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Alex Lewis for Laura Montes; Defense - Nick Davis and James Luster. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter n/a.) (USPO Kirksey.) (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Jericho Ray Martinez, Sammy Mike Cisneros held on 4/28/2021. Date of Arrest: 4/28/2021; Defts executed financial affidavits; o/appointing counsel entered; Rule 5(f) admonishment given; Preliminary & Detention Hearing set 5/3/21 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; o/temp detention entered; defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Alex Lewis for Laura Montes; Defense - Sean Colston & David Miles Brissette. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Kirksey.) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes, Alma Benavides-Fuentes: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jericho Ray Martinez (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Sammy Mike Cisneros (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes, Alma Benavides-Fuentes (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
10 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Jericho Ray Martinez, Sammy Mike Cisneros: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
10 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes, Alma Benavides-Fuentes. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 5/3/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Jericho Ray Martinez, Antonio Robles, Sammy Mike Cisneros (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Jericho Ray Martinez, Antonio Robles, Sammy Mike Cisneros. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 5/3/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
12 12 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/29/2021 as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes. (edm) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
13 13 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Jeffery Charles King,Jeffery Charles King for Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes,Jeffery Charles King for Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes. Motion filed by Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes as to Maria Elena Benavides-FuentesAttorney Jeffery Charles King added to party Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes(pty:dft) (King, Jeffery) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes (1)Retained Attorney Jeffery King substituted for appointed attorney Nick Davis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 4/30/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
17 17 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Jericho Ray Martinez, Sammy Mike Cisneros held on 5/3/2021; Deft Martinez waives PC; Gov't witness Keven Brown sworn & testified; Defense witness Maribel Teran sworn & testified as to detention for Deft Cisneros; Court finds PC as to Deft Martinez; Court takes the finding of PC under advisement as to Deft Cisneros and temporarily finds PC as pending hearing on May 10, 2021 at 10:30 a.m.; both Defts executed PR bonds and advised of conditions of pretrial release; o/setting conditions of pretrial release entered as to both Defts; Both Deft released on conditions. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Sean Colston & David Miles Brissette. (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:00. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Mouret.) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
17 17 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes held on 5/3/2021; Defendant waives PC; Court finds PC; Gov't witness Kevin Brown sworn & testified as to detention; defense provided affidavit from witness for court's review; Defense witness Sanjuana Fuentes sworn and testified through court interpreter Gricelda Samano; deft executed PR bond & advised of conditions of pretrial release; o/setting condition of pretrial release entered; deft released on conditions. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Laura Montes; Defense - Jeff King. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Mouret.) (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes (1) Deft released on PR bond; Deft to next appear as directed by the Court or U.S. Probation Officer; see order for specific conditions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/3/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jericho Ray Martinez (1)Deft released on PR bond; Deft to next appear as directed by the Court or U.S. Probation Officer; see order for specific conditions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/3/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Sammy Mike Cisneros (3)Deft released on PR bond; Deft to next appear as directed by the Court or U.S. Probation Officer; see order for specific conditions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/3/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
20 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Sammy Mike Cisneros: Preliminary Hearing set for 5/10/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/3/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
21 21 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Hearing not held on 5/7/2021 as to Sammy Mike Cisneros; the Court received notification that defendant w/draws request for further hearing on probable cause; the court previously temporary found PC pending further hearing; the court now finds Probable Cause as to defendant Cisneros and the hearing set for Monday 5/10/21 is cancelled. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - n/a; Defense - n/a. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :00. (Court Reporter: Not Recorded) (USPO n/a.) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
22 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Jericho Ray Martinez (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
23 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting22 Joint Motion to Continue Tim to Indict as to Jericho Ray Martinez (1): Continued until July 15, 2021 for the reasons stated in the joint motion and because the ends of justice served by the granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. see 18 USC 3161 (h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv) and (h)(7(B)(i). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/12/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ] (Entered: 05/12/2021)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
24 24 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Sammy Mike Cisneros (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
20 20 3 pgs Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes (Montes-DOJ, Laura) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
21 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting20 Motion to Continue as to Maria Elena Benavides-Fuentes (1) continued until July 15, 2021 for the reasons stated in the joint motion and because the ends of justice served by the granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. [see 18 USC 3161 (h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv) and (h)(7(B)(I) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/21/2021) (edm) [4:21-mj-00284-BJ] (Entered: 05/21/2021)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
27 27 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting24 Joint Motion to Continue as to Sammy Mike Cisneros (3) continued until July 15, 2021 for the reasons stated in the joint motion and because the ends of justice served by the granting of such continuance outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. see 18 USC 3161 (h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv) and (h)(7(B)(I (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/28/2021) (jah) [4:21-mj-00295-BJ] (Entered: 05/28/2021)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
28 28 2 pgs FELONY INFORMATION as to Maria Benavides-Fuentes (1) count 1, Jericho Ray Martinez (2) count 1, Sammy Mike Cisneros (3) count 1. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (pef)
Related: [-]