California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:21-cv-01196
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2021
Terminated:Nov 19, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 03, 2022 2:20 AM PST
Defendant
Healthy Eyes Optometry, Inc.
Represented By
Richard John Morin
Law Office Of Rick Morin, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lore Ameloot
Represented By
Russell Handy
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Center For Disability Access
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 19, 2021
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/19 11:21 AM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL Pursuant To F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(II) Jointly by Lore Ameloot. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 11/19 11:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/19/2021: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No.12 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/13 7:14 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Lore Ameloot. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 10/13 5:36 AM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT and request to vacate all currently set dates by Lore Ameloot. Attorney Seabock, Amanda Lockhart added.(Seabock, Amanda) Modified on 10/13/2021 (Kaminski, H)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/13 3:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy M. York for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/13/2021: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement (ECF No.9 ), the Court determined this case has settled. In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, dispositional documents are to be filed on or before 12/13/2021, instead of 11/8/2021. Accordingly, all other deadlines and hearings are VACATED. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (York, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/04 10:57 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Healthy Eyes Optometry, Inc.. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 08/04 10:57 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/04 10:56 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Healthy Eyes Optometry, Inc..(Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/04 10:55 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Richard John Morin on behalf of Healthy Eyes Optometry, Inc.. Attorney Morin, Richard John added. (Morin, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/02 9:12 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Healthy Eyes Optometry, Inc. served on 7/19/2021. (Handy, Russell) Modified on 8/2/2021 (Huang, H)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for TLN Thu 07/08 11:09 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Tupolo, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Thu 07/08 11:08 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Healthy Eyes Optometry, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Russell Handy* *Center for Disability Access* *8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200* *San Diego, CA 92111*. (Tupolo, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lore Ameloot. Attorney Handy, Russell added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9690422)(Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet