Armstead, et al v. County of Alameda, et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-05257 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 03, 2022 2:11 AM PST |
Defendant
County of Alameda
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jessie Chambers
|
|
Defendant
City of Oakland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melina Armstead
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A. A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
I. L.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
James Thomas
Terminated: 11/21/2021
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
129 | 129
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 01/24 10:19 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 128 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Status Conference previously set for 3/21/2024 is vacated. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
128 | 128
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 01/24 7:19 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE [FED.R.CIV.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)] AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by County of Alameda. (Murphy, Timothy) |