Washington Western District Court
Judge:James L Robart
Case #: 2:21-cv-00920
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2021
Re-opened:Jul 24, 2023
Terminated:May 14, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 05, 2022 12:53 AM PST
Defendant
World Vision Inc
Represented By
Scott J Ward
Gammon & Grange
contact info
Nathaniel L Taylor
Ellis Li & Mckinstry
contact info
Abigail Jane St Hilaire
Ellis Li & Mckinstry
contact info
John Matthew Szymanski
Gammon & Grange
contact info
Plaintiff
Aubry McMahon
Represented By
Michael C Subit
Frank Freed Subit & Thomas
contact info
Casimir Wolnowski
Nisar Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
misc Receipt Thu 06/13 10:50 AM
RECEIPT re74 Order on Stipulated Motion,,. $150,000 deposited into the Court Registry on 6/12/2024 Related [+] (SV)
Related: [-] ceipt # SEA200004964
Monday, June 10, 2024
74 74 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Mon 06/10 10:30 AM
ORDER granting Parties'73 Stipulated MOTION for Approval of Cash Security in Lieu of Bond and Order Staying Enforcement of Judgment . Defendant World Vision, Inc. may pay cash in the amount of $150,000 into the Registry of the Court as security under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 62(a)(1). Upon World Vision, Inc. posting of the above-described security, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 62(a)(1), all proceedings to enforce the order and final judgment (Dkt. No.69 ) will be automatically stayed until further order of this Court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS) (cc: Finance)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
73 73 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 06/07 2:31 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Approval of Cash Security in Lieu of Bond and Order Staying Enforcement of Judgment , filed by Defendant World Vision Inc. Noting Date 6/7/2024, (Taylor, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Approving Cash Security and Staying Enforcement of Judgment