Louisiana Western District Court
Case #: 6:20-cr-00171
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jul 11, 2021 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Brandon J Armstead (3)
Represented By
James Lorne Klock
Federal Public Defenders Office (laf)
contact info
Defendant
Rusty Ross Honore (1)
Represented By
John Kevin Stockstill
Law Office Of J Kevin Stockstill
contact info
Defendant
Ransome Wilkins, Jr (2)
Represented By
John S McLindon
Law Office Of John S Mclindon
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel J McCoy
U S Attorneys Office (laf)
contact info
John Woodley Nickel
U S Attorneys Office (laf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/11/2021 2:40 AM CDT
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
1 1 3 pgs SEALED INDICTMENT as to Rusty Ross Honore (1) count(s) 1, 2, Ransome Wilkins, Jr (2) count 1, Brandon J Armstead (3) count 1. (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 INDICTMENT WITH SIGNATURE filed under seal as to Rusty Ross Honore (1), Ransome Wilkins, Jr (2), Brandon J Armstead (3). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET filed under seal as to Rusty Ross Honore (1). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET filed under seal as to Ransome Wilkins, Jr (2). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET filed under seal as to Brandon J Armstead (3). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Seal Indictment/Case by USA as to Rusty Ross Honore (1), Ransome Wilkins, Jr (2), Brandon J Armstead (3). Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/19/2020. (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER granting6 Motion to Seal Indictment/Case as to Rusty Ross Honore (1), Ransome Wilkins Jr (2), Brandon J Armstead (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/19/2020. (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
8 8 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: GRAND JURY REPORT as to Rusty Ross Honore (1), Ransome Wilkins, Jr (2), Brandon J Armstead (3). Sealed Indictment. Warrants to issue. (Court Reporter: LCR, Lafayette-Courtroom 7) (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]