Damian Stinnie v. Richard Holcomb
Original Case: 3:16-cv-00044
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv.pr-01756 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 08, 2023 4:40 AM EDT |
Amicus Supporting Appellant
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF VIRGINIA, ET AL
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Rehearing Petition
INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD D. HOLCOMB, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAMIAN STINNIE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MELISSA ADAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ADRAINNE JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILLIEST BANDY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRIANNA MORGAN, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/08/2023 4:31 AM EDT |
Friday, July 09, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00044-NKM-JCH. Case manager: RSewell. 21-1756 RHS [Entered: 07/09/2021 11:11 AM] | |
2 | 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00044-NKM-JCH.. 21-1756 RHS [Entered: 07/09/2021 11:55 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michelle S. Kallen for Richard D. Holcomb. [1000983150] 21-1756 Michelle Kallen [Entered: 07/09/2021 01:13 PM] |