Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Referred: Shaniek Mills Maynard
Case #: 9:21-cv-81223
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2021
Re-opened:Apr 24, 2025
Terminated:Jan 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 08, 2022 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
Amanda Schumacher
Represented By
Daniel R. Levine
Padula Bennardo Levine, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Charles A Schumacher
Represented By
Daniel R. Levine
Padula Bennardo Levine, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Schumacher Auto Group Inc
Represented By
Daniel R. Levine
Padula Bennardo Levine, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Cortes
Represented By
Catherine Ann Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Mark Aloysius Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Marjorie T Hollman
Represented By
Catherine Ann Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Mark Aloysius Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Horowitz
Represented By
Catherine Ann Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Mark Aloysius Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Cameron N May
Represented By
Catherine Ann Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Mark Aloysius Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Lance Spikes
Represented By
Catherine Ann Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info
Mark Aloysius Cullen
The Cullen Law Firm PA
contact info

GPO May 31 2022
PAPERLESS ORDER denying 63 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/31/2022. (osd)
GPO May 31 2022
PAPERLESS ORDER denying 63 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/31/2022. (osd)
GPO Jun 01 2022
ORDER AFFIRMING AND ADOPTING REPORT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE; granting 39 Motion for Settlement; granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; granting 45 Motion for Settlement; Affirming and Adopting 61 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
GPO Jun 03 2022
ORDER denying 62 Motion for Protective Order and directing parties to confer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (osd)
GPO Dec 13 2022
OMNIBUS ORDER denying 38 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions ; granting in part and denying in part 97 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 12/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (osd) Modified Text on 12/13/2022 (ls).

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
220 220 order Scheduling Order Order Setting Status Conference Order Reopening Case Thu 04/24 3:31 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: ( Jury Trial set for 7/14/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 7/8/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith., In Limine Motions due by 6/6/2025.), ( Status Conference set for 5/8/2025 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodney Smith.). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]