Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-33636

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:21-ap-03035
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2021
Terminated:Jan 24, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Church Schools in the Diocese of Virginia
Represented By
Church Schools in the Diocese of Virginia
contact info
Defendant
St. Catherine's School
Represented By
St. Catherine's School
contact info
Defendant
St. Christopher's School
Represented By
St. Christopher's School
contact info
Defendant
Blackbaud Tuition Management
Represented By
Blackbaud Tuition Management
contact info
Defendant
Nelnet
Represented By
Nelnet
contact info
Defendant
Nelnet Business Services
Represented By
Nelnet Business Services
contact info
Defendant
Nelnet Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Nelnet Business Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
TMS (Tuition Management Systems)
Represented By
TMS (Tuition Management Systems)
contact info
Defendant
Jana Michelle Suyes
Represented By
Jana Michelle Suyes
contact info
Defendant
George V, LLC
Represented By
George V, LLC
contact info
Defendant
George V Revocable Trust
Represented By
George V Revocable Trust
contact info
Defendant
Scott D Stolte, in his capacity as Trustee for the George V Revocable Trust
Represented By
Scott D Stolte, in his capacity as Trustee for the George V Revocable Trust
contact info
Defendant
Robert J Wheaton, in his capacity as Trustee for the George V Revocable Trust, Jr.
Represented By
Robert J Wheaton, in his capacity as Trustee for the George V Revocable Trust, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
PO Box 538
South Hill, VA 23970
Represented By
Kevin A. Lake
Mcdonald, Sutton & Duval, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Monday, January 24, 2022
15 15 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Mon 01/24 11:24 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
14 14 court Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled Mon 12/20 6:53 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled; Complaint Dismissed Related [+] (Rintye, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
13 13 court Hearing Cancelled Mon 12/20 6:52 PM
Hearing Cancelled; Motion Withdrawn Related [+] (Rintye, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion to Extend Time filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
Friday, December 17, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 12/17 6:23 PM
Notice of Dismissal (Styled: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i), made applicable herein by FRBP 7041) Related [+] filed by Kevin A. Lake of McDonald, Sutton & Duval, PLC on behalf of Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee. (Lake, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
11 11 misc Withdrawal Fri 12/17 6:16 PM
Withdrawal Related [+] filed by Kevin A. Lake of McDonald, Sutton & Duval, PLC on behalf of Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee. (Lake, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion to Extend Time filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
10 10 motion Extend Time Tue 11/09 7:41 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint, with Proposed Order Appended filed by Kevin A. Lake of McDonald, Sutton & Duval, PLC on behalf of Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/5/2022 at 10:00 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Lake, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Entered in Error to Wrong Case Number: See entry Tue 11/09 9:56 AM
Entered in Error: See entry Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Alias Summons issued
8 8 court Alias Summons issued Tue 11/09 9:18 AM
Second Alias Summons issued. Answer Deadline: 12/9/2021 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (CORRECTED Alias Summons Reissued to Correct Answer Deadline.) (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Request for Alias Summons filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee,7 Alias Summons issued
7 7 court Alias Summons issued Tue 11/09 9:12 AM
Entered in Error: Second Alias Summons issued. Answer Deadline: 12/09/2021 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/5/2022 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia, (Smith, Linda) Modified on 11/9/2021 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Request for Alias Summons filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
Saturday, November 06, 2021
6 6 misc Request for Alias Summons Sat 11/06 11:56 AM
Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by Kevin A. Lake of McDonald, Sutton & Duval, PLC on behalf of Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee. (Lake, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Alias Summons issued
Monday, September 13, 2021
5 5 court Alias Summons issued Mon 09/13 1:17 PM
Alias Summons issued Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia, Answer Due: 10/13/2021 (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Request for Alias Summons filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
4 4 court Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled Mon 09/13 8:56 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled; Alias Summons requested Related [+] (rintyep)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
Thursday, September 09, 2021
3 3 misc Request for Alias Summons Thu 09/09 3:50 PM
Trustee's Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by Kevin A. Lake of McDonald, Sutton & Duval, PLC on behalf of Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee. (Lake, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
2 2 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 07/13 1:43 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Blackbaud Tuition Management Answer Due 8/12/2021; Church Schools in the Diocese of Virginia Answer Due 8/12/2021; George V Revocable Trust Answer Due 8/12/2021; George V, LLC Answer Due 8/12/2021; Nelnet Answer Due 8/12/2021; Nelnet Business Services Answer Due 8/12/2021; Nelnet Business Solutions, Inc. Answer Due 8/12/2021; St. Catherine's School Answer Due 8/12/2021; St. Christopher's School Answer Due 8/12/2021; Scott D Stolte, in his capacity as Trustee for the George V Revocable Trust Answer Due 8/12/2021; Jana Michelle Suyes Answer Due 8/12/2021; TMS (Tuition Management Systems) Answer Due 8/12/2021; Robert J Wheaton, in his capacity as Trustee for the George V Revocable Trust Jr. Answer Due 8/12/2021 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia, (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
Monday, July 12, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 07/12 10:32 PM
Adversary case 21-03035 Complaint against Church Schools in the Diocese of Virginia, St. Catherine's School, St. Christopher's School, Blackbaud Tuition Management, Nelnet, Nelnet Business Services, Nelnet Business Solutions, Inc., TMS (Tuition Management Systems), Jana Michelle Suyes, George V, LLC, George V Revocable Trust, Scott D Stolte, in his capacity as Trustee for the George V Revocable Trust, Robert J Wheaton, in his capacity as Trustee for the George V Revocable Trust Jr. (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-33636 (Lake, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits to Complaint
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet