Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-33636

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:21-ap-03037
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2021
Terminated:Sep 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Craig Rice
Represented By
Craig Rice
contact info
Plaintiff
Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
PO Box 538
South Hill, VA 23970
Represented By
Kevin A. Lake
Mcdonald, Sutton & Duval, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
5 5 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 09/29 12:28 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
4 4 court Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled Mon 09/13 8:55 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Cancelled; Notice of Dismissal filed Related [+] (rintyep)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
Thursday, September 09, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 09/09 4:07 PM
Trustee's Notice of Dismissal Related [+] filed by Kevin A. Lake of McDonald, Sutton & Duval, PLC on behalf of Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee. (Lake, Kevin)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
2 2 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 07/13 1:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Craig Rice Answer Due 8/12/2021 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia, (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee
Monday, July 12, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 07/12 11:47 PM
Adversary case 21-03037 Complaint against Craig Rice (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Bruce E. Robinson, Trustee. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-33636 (Lake, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits to Complaint
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet