Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Marcia A Crone
Referred: Zack Hawthorn
Case #: 1:21-cv-00356
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate/Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2021
Terminated:Sep 10, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
18 18 order Judgment Wed 09/11 11:15 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing this Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence as barred by the applicable statute of limitations. All motions not previously ruled on are denied (Motion9 terminated). Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/10/24. (tkd)
Related: [-]
17 17 5 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Wed 09/11 11:11 AM
ORDER overruling objections, adopting15 Report and Recommendation and granting13 Motion to Dismiss. A certificate of appealability will not be issued. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/10/24. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
16 16 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Fri 08/09 9:14 AM
OBJECTION to15 Report and Recommendation by Vicki Stark-Fitts. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
15 15 misc Report and Recommendations Thu 07/18 1:32 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the govt's13 Motion to Dismiss should be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/18/24. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 06/11 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bulkley Ross on behalf of USA (Ross, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 respoth Response to Non-Motion Tue 06/11 2:53 PM
RESPONSE to11 Order to Show Cause Govt's Motion to Dismiss 2255 Motion by USA.(Ross, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 26, 2024
12 12 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 04/26 3:15 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USA on 4/23/2024 as to11 Order to Show Cause. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/09 4:22 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER. The govt has 60 days from date of service to answer this 2255 motion and show cause why relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/9/24. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
10 10 misc Letter Wed 11/29 4:37 PM
LETTER from Vicki Stark-Fitts (mailed requested docket sheet) (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
9 9 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 05/26 2:57 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Vicki Stark-Fitts. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
8 8 mot2255 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Thu 05/26 2:50 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Vicki Stark-Fitts.(kcv, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Mon 04/25 1:16 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Vicki Stark-Fitts on 4/19/2022 re6 Order. (bjc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/11 10:51 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for extension of time to file Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Vicki Stark-Fitts. Movant has 60 days to file her motion to vacate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/11/22. (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
5 5 misc Letter Fri 04/08 2:13 PM
LETTER from Vicki Stark-Fitts (mailed another copy of doc #1 and docket sheet) (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
4 4 misc Letter Thu 02/17 1:02 PM
LETTER from Vicki Stark-Fitts (mailed Gen Ord 15-13 and a copy of doc #1) (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
3 3 misc Letter Wed 01/19 2:38 PM
LETTER from Vicki Stark-Fitts regarding requested extension of time to file 2255 motion (mailed docket sheet and blank 2255 form) (tkd, )
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 01/19 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Vicki Stark-Fitts from FCI Tallahassee, FL to FMC Carswell, Fort Worth, TX (tkd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
1 1 mot2255 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Tue 07/13 3:04 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Vicki Stark-Fitts.(kcv, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/13 3:05 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (kcv, )
Related: [-]