California Southern District Court
Case #: 2:21-mj-08588
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2021
Terminated:Jul 12, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 14, 2021 12:25 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Black I-phone Model A1778 FCC ID: BCG-E3091A IC: 579C-E3091A (1)
Terminated: 07/12/2021


Docket last updated: 07/14/2021 12:49 AM PDT
Monday, July 12, 2021
1 1 APPLICATION FOR A WARRANT BY TELEPHONE OR OTHER RELIABLE ELECTRONIC MEANS entered as to Black I-phone Model A1778 FCC ID: BCG-E3091A IC: 579C-E3091A. (ccc)
Related: [-]