California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:21-bk-15683
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Michael Levine, Inc.
920 Maple Ave
Los Angeles, CA 90015-1812
Represented By
Susan K Seflin
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Seror Weber LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 07/13/2021 5:00 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 07/14 8:46 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:21-bk-15683] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53162047. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 07/14 8:42 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Michael Levine, Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 07/28/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 07/28/2021. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 07/28/2021. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 07/28/2021. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 07/28/2021. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 07/28/2021. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 07/28/2021. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 07/28/2021. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 07/28/2021. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 07/28/2021. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 07/28/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 07/28/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 07/28/2021. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 07/28/2021. Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) due by 07/28/2021. Schedule J-2: Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 (Form 106J-2) due 07/28/2021. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 07/28/2021. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 07/28/2021. Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature - Form 119 due by 07/28/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer (Form 2800) due 07/28/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 07/28/2021. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 07/28/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 07/28/2021. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 10/12/2021. (Seflin, Susan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Tax Documents Wed 07/14 8:50 AM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2019 Filed by Debtor Michael Levine, Inc.. (Seflin, Susan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Original signature page Wed 07/14 9:42 AM
Original signature page Voluntary Petition Non-Individual [Docket #1] Notice of Submission of Attorney Signature Page with Petition Filed by Debtor Michael Levine, Inc.. (Seflin, Susan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement Wed 07/14 10:51 AM
Statement Debtor's Statement Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1116 Filed by Debtor Michael Levine, Inc.. (Bagdanov, Jessica)
Related: [-]