Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Kathleen Kay
Case #: 2:21-cv-02025
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Terminated:Mar 15, 2022
Case in other court:14th JDC (Calcasieu), 21-01950
Last checked: Monday Jan 10, 2022 3:05 AM CST
Defendant
Safeco Insurance Co of Oregon
Represented By
Patrick J Lorio
Pipes Miles & Beckman
contact info
H Minor Pipes, III
Pipes Miles & Beckman
contact info
Mary Elizabeth Ingram
Pipes Miles & Beckman
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Gaspard
Represented By
Michael Keith Prudhomme
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Matthew Patrick Keating
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Jamie Christopher Gary
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Wesley Alan Romero
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
David P Bruchhaus
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Chad E Mudd
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Gaspard
Represented By
Michael Keith Prudhomme
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Matthew Patrick Keating
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Jamie Christopher Gary
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Wesley Alan Romero
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
David P Bruchhaus
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Chad E Mudd
Mudd Bruchhaus & Keating (lc)
contact info
Special Master
Cade Richard Cole
Represented By
Cade Richard Cole
Law Office Of Cade R Cole
contact info
Special Master
Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Represented By
Patrick A Juneau, Jr
Juneau David
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Safeco Property Insurance Corp
Terminated: 07/14/2021


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Tue 03/15 3:21 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL granting8 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 3/15/2022. (crt,Benoit, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2022
8 8 motion Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Mon 03/14 11:04 AM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Safeco Insurance Co of Oregon, Robert Gaspard, Tammy Gaspard. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/14/2022.(aty,Lorio, Patrick) Modified on 3/14/2022 to add filers. (Alexander, E)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/21 4:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Co of Oregon.(aty,Ingram, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
6 6 order Removal Order Tue 07/20 9:28 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 7/19/2021. (crt,Benoit, T)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 07/15 2:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Co of Oregon identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Co of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Co Inc, Corporate Parent Safeco Corp, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corp, Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Co of Oregon, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for Safeco Insurance Co of Oregon. (aty,Lorio, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
4 4 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Wed 07/14 4:57 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/14/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
Related: [-]
3 3 9 pgs order Order Wed 07/14 4:50 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Safeco Property Insurance Corporation. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021..(crt,Mitchell, P)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
2 2 misc Response to Removal Order Wed 07/14 1:57 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Safeco Property Insurance Corporation Notice of Compliance . (aty,Lorio, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 07/14 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2021-1950 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4737666) filed by Safeco Property Insurance Corporation.(Attorney Patrick J Lorio added to party Safeco Property Insurance Corporation(pty:dft))(aty,Lorio, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 5 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party
service Summons Issued Wed 07/14 4:33 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Safeco Insurance Co of Oregon in the 14th JDC, Parish of Calcasieu. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 (p.33) to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/14 4:42 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, P)
Related: [-]