Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela A Carlos
Case #: 5:21-cv-03133
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Terminated:Feb 18, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 10, 2022 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
RUTH DOUTRICH
Represented By
BETH ANN EBERSOLE
Blakinger Thomas, PC
contact info
S. WHITNEY RAHMAN
Blakinger Thomas, PC
contact info
Defendant
TIM DOUTRICH
Represented By
BETH ANN EBERSOLE
Blakinger Thomas, PC
contact info
S. WHITNEY RAHMAN
Blakinger Thomas, PC
contact info
Defendant
PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC.
Represented By
BETH ANN EBERSOLE
Blakinger Thomas, PC
contact info
S. WHITNEY RAHMAN
Blakinger Thomas, PC
contact info
Defendant
CHARLES ROTH
Represented By
BETH ANN EBERSOLE
Blakinger Thomas, PC
contact info
S. WHITNEY RAHMAN
Blakinger Thomas, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN L. WENGER
Represented By
RICHARD L. HACKMAN
Saxton & Stump LLC
contact info
KATY S. LANDIS
Saxton & Stump
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, February 18, 2022
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Approval Fri 02/18 11:12 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION (ECF NO.37 ) IS GRANTED. THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS APPROVED. THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. EXCEPT AS OTHERWISE PROVIDED IN THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR ITS OWN ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. THE CASE IS CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING STATISTICS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 2/17/22.2/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
37 37 4 pgs motion Approval Wed 02/16 5:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement and General Release and Dismissal with Prejudice filed by RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH..(EBERSOLE, BETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 11, 2022
36 36 order Consent and Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 02/11 4:54 PM
CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. § 636(C) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 73.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/11/22. 2/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
35 35 1 pgs misc Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Fri 02/11 8:03 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re34 Transcript - PDF,, 2/11/22 Entered and Copies Emailed. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Transcript - PDF Fri 02/11 7:59 AM
TRANSCRIPT of TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT held on 2/7/22, before Judge HONORABLE PAMELA A. CARLOS. Court Reporter: ESR/ Transcriber: TRANSCRIPTS PLUS, INC.. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2022. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 02/08 4:37 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NOS.21 -22 , ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/8/22.2/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
32 32 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 02/08 12:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. Settlement Conference held on 2/7/22. (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
31 31 respoth Response Tue 02/01 6:04 PM
Response in Opposition to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by JOHN L. WENGER. (HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-E,
Att: 2 Exhibit F-G,
Att: 3 Exhibit H1,
Att: 4 Exhibit H2,
Att: 5 Exhibit H2a,
Att: 6 Exhibit H3,
Att: 7 Exhibit I-BB
30 30 30+ pgs respm Memorandum Tue 02/01 5:48 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN L. WENGER.(HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Unpublished Cases
29 29 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum Tue 02/01 4:48 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH. (EBERSOLE, BETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
28 28 respoth Response Tue 02/01 4:43 PM
Response to the Concise Statement of Undisputed Material Facts of Plaintiff in Support of Summary Judgment by RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH. (EBERSOLE, BETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS 1 - 10
Friday, January 21, 2022
27 27 trial Exhibit Fri 01/21 4:11 PM
EXHIBIT 2 of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc No. 21) Revised Pursuant to Court's 1-20-22 Order by RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH..(RAHMAN, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
26 26 trial Exhibit Fri 01/21 2:08 PM
EXHIBIT 1 Revised Pursuant to Court's 1.20.22 Order for Doc No. 20 by JOHN L. WENGER.. (HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Thu 01/20 10:02 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO SEAL, ECF NOS.18 AND20 , ARE GRANTED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: 1. PAGES 206:1 THROUGH 213:8 OF PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT SHALL REMAIN SEALED, WITH ONLY REDACTED VERSIONS ON THE DOCKET. 2. THE REMAINING PORTION OF PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT THAT WAS DESIGNATED FOR ATTORNEYS EYES ONLY, STARTING WITH PAGE 213:9, DOES NOT PERTAIN TO CONFIDENTIAL MEDICAL INFORMATION OR PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION, AND SHALL BE UNSEALED. COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES ARE DIRECTED, AS TO THEIR OWN EXHIBITS, TO REPLACE ANY PREVIOUSLY REDACTED PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT WITH UNREDACTED PORTIONS STARTING AT LINE 9, PAGE 213. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/20/22.1/20/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
24 24 misc Statement Tue 01/18 7:46 PM
Statement of Undisputed Material Facts of Plaintiff in Support of Summary Judgment by JOHN L. WENGER.(HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D,
Att: 2 Exhibit E-Z,
Att: 3 Exhibit AA-JJ,
Att: 4 Exhibit KK-YY
23 23 30+ pgs respm Memorandum Tue 01/18 7:25 PM
Memorandum re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN L. WENGER.(HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unpublished Cases
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Tue 01/18 7:20 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN L. WENGER.Certificate of Service.(HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Tue 01/18 5:54 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(RAHMAN, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Timothy Doutrich,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 3) - Redacted Transcript of John L. Wenger,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of 3) - Redacted Transcript of John L. Wenger,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Part 3 of 3) - Redacted Transcript of John L. Wenger,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Charles Roth,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Transcript of Tim Doutrich,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Transcript of Ruth Doutrich,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 -Transcript of Michael McCullough,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
20 20 motion Seal Tue 01/18 4:33 PM
MOTION to Seal filed by JOHN L. WENGER.Brief, Certificate of Service.(LANDIS, KATY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 01/18 4:01 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION, ECF NO.18 -1, IS CONDITIONALLY GRANTED PENDING BRIEFING BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE REDACTED VERSIONS OF THE DOCUMENT. ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 24, 2022, PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A BRIEF SHOWING GOOD CAUSE TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT. COUNSEL SHALL SEND AN UNREDACTED VERSION TO CHAMBERS FOR REVIEW. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO TIMELY RESPOND OR FAILS TO SHOW GOOD CAUSE TO SEAL, THE COURT WILL DIRECT DEFENDANTS TO REPLACE ANY FILINGS WITH UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF THE DOCUMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/18/22.1/18/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Seal Tue 01/18 11:18 AM
MOTION to Seal filed by RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH.Brief and Certificate of Service.(RAHMAN, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief
Friday, January 07, 2022
17 17 service Certificate of Service Fri 01/07 9:01 AM
CERTIFICATE OF CONCURRENCE to file13 Amended Complaint by JOHN L. WENGER. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (LANDIS, KATY) Modified on 1/7/2022 (va)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/05 12:52 PM
ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/7/2022 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 1/5/22. 1/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 01/05 12:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. Pretrial Conference held on 1/5/22. (mas, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 12/22 2:38 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH.(RAHMAN, S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/15 3:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH, filed by JOHN L. WENGER.(HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
12 12 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/14 1:40 PM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/5/2022 09:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 12/14/21. 12/14/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Mon 12/13 12:20 PM
ORDER THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR AFTER JANUARY 18, 2022. IN THE EVENT ANY DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET ENTERED AN APPEARANCE AT THE TIME OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THAT DEFENDANT. AS A MATTER OF STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURE, THE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES IN THE NEAR FUTURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 12/13/21. 12/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 12/08 11:37 AM
ORDER THAT THE9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE DISCOVERY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 12/7/21.12/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
9 9 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/06 10:35 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extension of Deadlines filed by JOHN L. WENGER.Certificate of Service.(HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/30 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BETH ANN EBERSOLE on behalf of RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH (EBERSOLE, BETH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
7 7 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 10/20 4:34 PM
ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/6/2022 02:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/18/2022; MOTIONS DUE BY 1/18/2022; TRIAL DATE SET FOR 4/11/2022 09:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.; EC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/20/21. 10/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
6 6 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 10/19 4:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. Pretrial Conference held on 10/19/21. (mas, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
5 5 7 pgs notice Notice of Hearing Thu 10/07 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, OCTOBER 19, 2021, AT 4:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. SEE NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INFORMATION.(dja, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
4 4 43 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/24 2:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants with Certificate of Service by RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH.(RAHMAN, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/16 8:23 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN L. WENGER. All Defendants. (HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
2 2 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/15 5:02 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/15/21. 7/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 07/15 1:42 PM
Summons Issued as to RUTH DOUTRICH, TIM DOUTRICH, PARADISE CUSTOM KITCHENS, INC., CHARLES ROTH. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/15/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 07/14 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15253351.), filed by JOHN L. WENGER.(HACKMAN, RICHARD)
Related: [-]