California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 5:21-cv-05400
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2021
Terminated:Oct 15, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jan 10, 2022 12:46 AM PST
Defendant
Birkshire Hathaway Inc.
Defendant
Heather Wang
Defendant
Rick Trevino
Defendant
Joseph Tang
Defendant
South County District Attorney
Defendant
South County Criminal Court
Defendant
Santa Clara Family Justice Center
Defendant
Judge Sharon Roper
Defendant
Murat Ozgur
Defendant
Shelly O'Brien
Defendant
Karl Nastrom
Defendant
Moreno Family Law Firm
Represented By
Joanna Lee Storey
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Cassidy E. Chivers
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael H. Moreno
Defendant
Marilyn Moreno
Represented By
Joanna Lee Storey
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Cassidy E. Chivers
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
J. Hector Moreno
Represented By
Joanna Lee Storey
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Cassidy E. Chivers
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Moles
Defendant
Law Firm of J. Hector Moreno
Represented By
Joanna Lee Storey
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Cassidy E. Chivers
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Intero Real Estate Services
Defendant
Gomez-Edwards Law Group
Represented By
Louis Harrison Castoria
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Natalie Gomez
Represented By
Louis Harrison Castoria
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Judge Julie Emede
Defendant
Lauren Edwards
Represented By
Louis Harrison Castoria
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brian Crane
Defendant
County of Santa Clara
Represented By
Jose Luis Martinez
Office Of The County Counsel, County Of Santa Clara
contact info
Plaintiff
Brent Oster
444 Alaska Avenue Suite #BDZ550
Torrance, CA 90503
Plaintiff
Kathia Portuguez Oster

GPO Jul 26 2021
SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:20-cv-07828 BLF with 5:21-cv-05400 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/26/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2021: # (1) Signed Order) (lmh, COURT STAFF).

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 16, 2021
13 13 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 09/16 6:24 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss and REQUEST for Reassignment to a District Court Judge. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/16/2021. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
12 12 misc Objection Wed 09/15 4:41 PM
GOMEZ EDWARDS DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS FILING OF ECF NO. 11, "PROOF OF SERVICE" filed by Lauren Edwards, Natalie Gomez, Gomez-Edwards Law Group. (Castoria, Louis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
11 11 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 09/08 2:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Brent Oster of re7 Amended Complaint. (tnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
10 10 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/27 4:30 PM
ORDER RE Request for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Re: Dkt. No. 7 . Oster must update his mailing address with the Court and file a consent/declination form by 9/8/2021. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 8/27/2021.(lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent/Declination form
Friday, August 20, 2021
9 9 misc Mail Returned Mon 08/23 9:53 AM
Mail sent to Brent Oster returned as undeliverable re3 Summons Issued. Re-Sent to New Address. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/20 2:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Birkshire Hathaway Inc., County of Santa Clara, Brian Crane, Lauren Edwards, Julie Emede, Natalie Gomez, Gomez-Edwards Law Group, Intero Real Estate Services, Law Firm of J. Hector Moreno, Christopher Moles, J. Hector Moreno, Marilyn Moreno, Michael H. Moreno, Moreno Family Law Firm, Karl Nastrom, Shelly O'Brien, Murat Ozgur, Sharon Roper, Santa Clara Family Justice Center, South County Criminal Court, South County District Attorney, Joseph Tang, Rick Trevino, Heather Wang. Filed byKathia Portuguez Oster, Brent Oster.(sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Part 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Part 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Part 5
Monday, August 16, 2021
8 8 misc Mail Returned Fri 08/20 3:21 PM
Mail sent to Brent Oster returned as undeliverable re5 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination, Resent to Updated address. (sfbS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 30, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/30 12:02 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/30/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
5 5 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 07/26 3:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/9/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Mon 07/26 1:22 PM
SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:20-cv-07828 BLF with 5:21-cv-05400 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/26/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/26/2021) Signed Order
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 07/14 3:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Birkshire Hathaway Inc., County of Santa Clara, Brian Crane, Lauren Edwards, Julie Emede, Natalie Gomez, Gomez-Edwards Law Group, Intero Real Estate Services, Law Firm of J. Hector Moreno, Christopher Moles, J. Hector Moreno, Marilyn Moreno, Michael H. Moreno, Moreno Family Law Firm, Karl Nastrom, Shelly O'Brien, Murat Ozgur, Sharon Roper, Santa Clara Family Justice Center, South County Criminal Court, South County District Attorney, Joseph Tang, Rick Trevino, Heather Wang. (wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 07/14 3:01 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor.(wsnS, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/14 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt 34611155289). Filed by Brent Oster. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2021.(wsnS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibits Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibits Part 3,
Att: 4 Exhibits Part 4,
Att: 5 Exhibits Part 5,
Att: 6 Exhibits Part 6,
Att: 7 Exhibits Part 7,
Att: 8 Exhibits Part 8,
Att: 9 Exhibits Part 9,
Att: 10 Exhibits Part 10,
Att: 11 Exhibits Part 11,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 13 Proposed Summons,
Att: 14 Receipt