Netchoice LLC, et al v. Attorney General, State of Florida, et al
Original Case: 4:21-cv-00220
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-prici-12355 |
Type | private civil / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 2:02 PM EDT |
FIRST AMENDMENT LAW PROFESSORS
|
Represented By
|
FLOOR64, INC., D/B/A THE COPIA INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
CATO INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
THE KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
|
Represented By
|
ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
AMERICA FIRST POLICY INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CATO INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
WASHINGTON CENTER FOR TECHNOLOGY POLICY INCLUSION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
TECHNET
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PROGRESSIVE POLCIY INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
NATIONAL BLACK JUSTICE COALITION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
LGBT TECH INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND INNOVATION FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ENGINE ADVOCACY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CTA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
FIRST AMENDMENT LAW PROFESSORS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN BOOKSELLERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE AUTHORS GUILD, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE MEDIA COALITION FOUNDATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE MEDIA LAW RESOURCE CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PEN AMERICAN CENTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
INTERNET ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
IP JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CHRISTOPHER COX
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
FLOOR64, INC., D/B/A THE COPIA INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CHAMBER OF PROGRESS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
INSTITUTE FOR FREE SPEECH
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
THE BABYLON BEE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
NOT THE BEE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF TEXAS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ALABAMA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ALASKA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ARIZONA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF ARKANSAS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MISSOURI
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF MONTANA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICA FIRST POLICY INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
TECHFREEDOM
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
CONNECTED COMMERCE COUNCIL
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
STATE OF KENTUCKY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
COMMISSIONERS OF THE FLORIDA ELECTIONS COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF FLORIDA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JONI ALEXIS POITIER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JASON TODD ALLEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
JOHN MARTIN HAYES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
PATRICK GILLESPIE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
DEPUTY SECRETARY OF BUSINESS OPERATIONS OF THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGEMENT SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, d.b.a. CCIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
NETCHOICE LLC, d.b.a. Netchoice
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 23 2022
Opinion issued by court as to Appellants Jason Todd Allen, Attorney General, State of Florida, Deputy Secretary of Business Operations of The Florida Department of Management Services, John Martin Hayes, Joni Alexis Poitier and Kymberlee Curry Smith. Decision: Affirmed in part, Vacated and Remanded in part. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 2:02 PM EDT |