Golden v. Cogency Global Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36314
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36314
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:21-ap-03525 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cogency Global Inc.
122 East 42nd Street 18th Floor
New York, NY 10168 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel H. Golden, as Liquidating Trustee of the DFC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 11:52 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Monday, February 21, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 02/21 2:27 PM
Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3525 Closed. (emiller) |
||
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 11/04 11:14 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Daniel H. Golden(Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 28, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 07/28 11:25 AM
Summons Service Executed on Cogency Global Inc. 7/27/2021. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
court
Summons Issued
Thu 07/22 1:49 PM
Summons Issued on Cogency Global Inc. Date Issued 7/22/2021. (hcar) |
|
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/21 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2021. (Admin.) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 07/21 11:16 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Cogency Global Inc.. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Sunday, July 18, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Sun 07/18 6:00 AM
|
|
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 07/15 10:32 AM
Adversary case 21-03525 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Daniel H. Golden against Cogency Global Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 07/15 1:17 PM
Receipt of Complaint 21-03525 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23149116. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |