Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36314

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:21-ap-03577
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2021
Terminated:Feb 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gray Transportation, Inc.
2459 GT Drive
Waterloo, IA 50704
Represented By
Gray Transportation, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel H. Golden, as Liquidating Trustee of the DFC Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Daniel H. Golden
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
court Case Reassigned-Adversary Tue 10/17 12:11 PM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 21, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/21 3:02 PM
Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3577 Closed. (emiller)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/15 8:28 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Daniel H. Golden (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
8 8 notice Notice Fri 11/12 10:04 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator . Filed by Daniel H. Golden (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/20 4:52 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Related [+] Filed by Gray Transportation, Inc. (Acosta, H)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/28 12:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Gray Transportation, Inc. 7/27/2021. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
5 5 court Summons Issued Thu 07/22 3:26 PM
Summons Issued on Gray Transportation, Inc. Date Issued 7/22/2021. (hcar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/21 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
3 3 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Wed 07/21 1:05 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Gray Transportation, Inc.. (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 18, 2021
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Sun 07/18 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Thu 07/15 11:54 AM
Adversary case 21-03577 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Daniel H. Golden against Gray Transportation, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd none Thu 07/15 2:40 PM
Receipt of Complaint 21-03577 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23149710. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]