Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Nathaniel M Gorton
Referred: M Page Kelley
Case #: 1:21-cv-11164
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2021
Terminated:Jul 18, 2022
Case in other court:Plymouth Superior Court, 2183CV00475
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 11, 2022 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Duxbury Public Schools
Represented By
John J. Davis
Pierce Davis & Perritano LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Marshall
766 Temple Street
Duxbury, MA 02332
Represented By
Marcus L. Scott
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, July 18, 2022
28 28 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/18 11:22 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Order On Report and Recommendations Mon 07/18 9:46 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for25 Report and Recommendations; After consideration of the "opposition" thereto (Docket No.26 ) which is treated as an objection thereto and is incomprehensible, Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted. (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report and Recommendations
Thursday, June 16, 2022
26 26 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/16 4:37 PM
First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 41(b) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Robert Marshall. (Scott, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
25 25 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 06/02 2:55 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. Report and recommendation of entry of dismissal without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2022. (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/03 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus L. Scott on behalf of Robert Marshall (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order On Report and Recommendations Fri 12/10 3:29 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered. ORDER ADOPTING ON20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: terminating5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Duxbury Public Schools, and finding as moot18 Motion for Extension of Time to File filed by Robert Marshall. "Report and recommendations accepted and adopted."(Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/10 3:31 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 1/3/2022. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
misc Copy Mailed Fri 12/10 3:57 PM
Copy re 22 Set/Reset Deadlines,21 Order on Report and Recommendations, mailed to Robert Marshall on 10/10/21. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
20 20 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 11/05 3:22 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 41(b) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Duxbury Public Schools Objections to R&R due by 11/19/2021 (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
19 19 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 11/04 8:00 AM
Opposition re18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE BY WHICH PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL MUST FILE AN APPEARANCE) filed by Duxbury Public Schools. (Davis, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 11/03 2:26 PM
MOTION to Extend the Deadline by which Plaintiff's Counsel Must File an Appearance. by Robert Marshall.(Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
minutes Motion Hearing Fri 10/01 10:41 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2021 by video re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 41(b) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Duxbury Public Schools. Plaintiff appears by video. The court urges Mr. Marshall to hire an attorney to represent him. Plaintiffs counsel shall file an appearance by November 14, 2021 and address the pending motion re:5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Davis) (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/20 9:42 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2021 by video re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Plaintiff did not show up for the hearing. Defense counsel will notify the court if he hears from the Plaintiff. Motion hearing rescheduled re:5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for 10/1/2021 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Davis) (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
14 14 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/02 1:12 PM
Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Regarding5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 41(b) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Duxbury Public Schools. The court will hold a hearing on this motion by zoom on Friday, September 17, 2021 at 2:30 p.m. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2021 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley.)(Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
13 13 order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/20 4:41 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 41(b) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Duxbury Public Schools to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelley(McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
12 12 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/19 9:33 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
11 11 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Tue 08/17 10:07 AM
STATE COURT Record.(Davis, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, August 12, 2021
10 10 misc Copy Mailed Thu 08/12 1:09 PM
Copy re 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time mailed to Robert Marshall on 8/12/21. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 08/12 11:57 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to September 9, 2021 to File Certified State Court Record Late (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
8 8 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/11 3:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to September 9, 2021 to File Certified State Court Record Late by Duxbury Public Schools.(Davis, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
7 7 notice Certificate of Consultation pursuant to LR 7.1 Wed 08/04 4:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 41(b) & 12(b)(6)) by John J. Davis on behalf of Duxbury Public Schools. (Davis, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 08/04 4:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 41(b) & 12(b)(6)) filed by Duxbury Public Schools. (Davis, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/04 4:49 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT UNDER RULES 41(b) & 12(b)(6)) by Duxbury Public Schools.(Davis, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
4 4 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Thu 07/15 4:00 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 07/15 3:55 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/15 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Davis on behalf of Duxbury Public Schools (Davis, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 07/15 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Duxbury Public Schools ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8860691 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Davis, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Form